This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 08/31/2019 at 18:51:25 (UTC).

THERM ALL INSULATION INC, vs. GLOBAL DEVELOPMENT & EXPANSION INC,

Case Summary

On 12/01/2004 THERM ALL INSULATION INC, filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GLOBAL DEVELOPMENT EXPANSION INC,. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Evellen H Jewett. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************42-O

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Evellen H Jewett

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

THERM ALL INSULATION INC

THERM ALL AKA

Defendant

GLOBAL DEVELOPMENT & EXPANSION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAWRENCE KOSTO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

02/08/2005

DocketVoluntary Dismissal

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2005

DocketVoluntary Dismissal; Comments: Voluntary Dismissal|VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL RECORDED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2005

DocketStipulation

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2005

DocketHEARING - Notice to Appear - Plogstedt, Antoinette D

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2005

DocketHEARING - Notice to Appear - County Civil Mediation, County Civil Mediation

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2005

DocketStipulation (Case Closing); Comments: Stipulation (Case Closing)|STIPULATION (CASE CLOSING) BEFORE HEARING RECORDED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/19/2005

DocketSummary of Proceedings; Comments: Summary of Proceedings|SUMMARY OF PROCEEDINGS/STIPULATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/22/2004

DocketNotice to Appear; Comments: Notice to Appear|NOTICE TO APPEAR RETURNED SERVED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/03/2004

DocketNotice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: Notice to Appear Scheduled for|NOTICE TO APPEAR ISSUED 01/19/2005 09:00 A.M. ORIG KOSTO+ROTELLA CP ATTY (F)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2004

DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Comments: Civil Cover Sheet|CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2004

DocketInitial Judge Assigned; Comments: Initial Judge Assigned|INITIAL JUDGE ASSIGNED ARNOLD, C J 71

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2004

DocketStatement of Claim; Comments: Statement of Claim|STATEMENT OF CLAIM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/02/2004

DocketDescription: Payment; Payer: THERM ALL INSULATION INC; Amount: -255.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/02/2004

DocketDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 255.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less