This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 11/17/2020 at 22:13:24 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS. WHISENANT, HAROLD PHILLIP

Case Summary

On 07/10/1995 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against WHISENANT, HAROLD PHILLIP. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Winter Park Branch located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Faye L Allen. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************-A-E

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/1995

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Faye L Allen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

HAROLD PHILLIP WHISENANT

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/1996
  • DocketNo Information Notice; Comments: NO INFORMATION NOTICE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/1996
  • DocketBOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond BB483161

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/1995
  • DocketJoint Stipulation for Continuance; Comments: JOINT STIPULATION FOR CONTINUATION AND ABEYANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/1995
  • DocketOrder; Comments: ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION FOR CONTINUANCE AND ABEYANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/1995
  • DocketCorrespondence; Comments: CORRESPONDENCE FILED FROM STATE ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/1995
  • DocketCorrespondence; Comments: CORRESPONDENCE FILED RE: P.T.D. BY STATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/1995
  • DocketWaiver of Speedy Trial; Comments: WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/1995
  • DocketPre-Trial Diversion Contract; Comments: PRE-TRIAL DIVERSION CONTRACT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/1995
  • DocketIn Open Court; Comments: IN OPEN COURT ARG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/1995
  • DocketOrder; Comments: ORDER REFER BACT TO STATE. DEFT. REFERED TO PRE-TRIAL DIVERSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/1995
  • DocketOrder of Disposition; Comments: ORDER OF DISPOSITION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/1995
  • DocketNotice of Inquiry; Comments: NOTICE OF ARGN ISSUED RET:[08/23/95]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/1995
  • DocketNotice of Inquiry; Comments: NOTICE OF ARGN ISSUED RET:[08/02/95]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/1995
  • DocketComplaint; Comments: COMPLAINT FILED DOA: 7/2/95

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/1995
  • DocketIn Open Court; Comments: IN OPEN COURT (IA) ON 7/3/95

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/1995
  • DocketAppearance of Defendant Entered; Comments: APPEARANCE OF DEFENDANT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/1995
  • DocketAdvice to Defendant, First Appearance; Comments: ADVICE TO DEFENDANT, FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/1995
  • DocketReferred to Public Defender (Temp); Comments: REFFERED TO PUBLIC DEFENDER (TEMP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/1995
  • DocketBond $ Inmate #; Comments: BOND $2,500 INMATE #95-26344

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/1995
  • DocketBond Filed; Comments: COPY OF ACTION BOND $2,500 ARG 8/2/95

    Read MoreRead Less