This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 11/11/2020 at 22:33:52 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA - VS - VENTURA, PIEDAD LUIS

Case Summary

On 02/23/1995 STATE OF FLORIDA - filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against - VENTURA, PIEDAD LUIS. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Apopka Branch located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Eric H DuBois. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************-A-A

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/1995

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Eric H DuBois

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

PIEDAD LUIS VENTURA

 

Court Documents

Order

Order

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2014
  • DocketViolation of Probation Warrant Returned Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2000
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2000
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 105.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/1995
  • DocketAffidavit for Violation of Probation; Comments: AFFIDAVIT FOR VIOLATION OF PROBATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/1995
  • DocketWarrant Issued Returnable Instanter; Comments: WARRANT ISSUED RETURNABLE INSTANTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/1995
  • DocketCorrespondence; Comments: CORRESPONDENCE FILED FROM PROBATION TO JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/1995
  • DocketPer the Court:; Comments: SUBPOENA LIST FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/1995
  • DocketPlea; Comments: PLEA SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/1995
  • DocketDisposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/1995
  • DocketComplaint; Comments: COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/1995
  • DocketIn Open Court; Comments: IN OPEN COURT IA/ARG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/1995
  • DocketAppearance of Defendant Entered; Comments: APPEARANCE OF DEFENDANT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/1995
  • DocketPlea of Nolo Contendere Entered; Comments: PLEA OF NOLO CONTENDERE ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/1995
  • DocketAdjudication Withheld; Comments: ADJUDICATION WITHHELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/1995
  • DocketSent:; Comments: SENTENCE 6 MOS. S/P W/CONDS; IMP. CONT., COMP. W/IN 5 MOS. SERVE 2 DAYS OCJ W/C FOR 2 DAYS T/S. PAY C.C. W/IN 5 MOS. PROB. MAY BE TERM. EARLY. NOT RETURN TO BI-LO'S FOR 6 MOS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/1995
  • DocketDisposition Slip; Comments: DISPOSITION SLIP FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/1995
  • DocketAffidavit of Insolvency and Indigency; Comments: AFF/INSOL FILED REF PD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/1995
  • DocketAdvice to Defendant, First Appearance; Comments: ADVICE TO DEFENDANT, FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less