This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 12/22/2020 at 00:43:31 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS. TALAMONI, SAVI A

Case Summary

On 06/03/1997 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against TALAMONI, SAVI A. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Ocoee Branch located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Steve Jewett. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************-A-W

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/1997

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Ocoee Branch

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Steve Jewett

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

SAVI A TALAMONI

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

06/16/1997

DocketBond Discharged; Comments: BOND DISCHARGED 37447

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/1997

DocketTransmittal to Accounting - Release Cash Bond; Comments: TRANSMITTAL TO ACCT - RELEASE CASH BOND

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/12/1997

DocketNo Information Notice; Comments: NO INFORMATION NOTICE FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/12/1997

DocketBOND - Charge 1 Cash Bond 37447

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/1997

DocketNotice of Inquiry; Comments: NOTICE OF ARGN ISSUED RET:[07/08/97]

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/1997

DocketBond Filed; Comments: CASH BOND FILED RET 7/2/97 $1000 37447

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/03/1997

DocketComplaint; Comments: COMPLAINT FILED-DOA-06/02/97

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/03/1997

DocketBond $ Inmate #; Comments: BOND $1000.00 INMATE #*97-22559

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/1997

DocketIn Open Court; Comments: IN OPEN COURT INITIAL APPEARANCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/1997

DocketAppearance of Defendant Entered; Comments: APPEARANCE OF DEFENDANT ENTERED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/1997

DocketAdvice to Defendant, First Appearance; Comments: ADVICE TO DEFENDANT, FIRST APPEARANCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/02/1997

DocketBond Filed; Comments: BOND SET AT $1000.00/NO CONTACT WHATSOEVER WITH VICTIM.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less