This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 01/14/2021 at 20:46:48 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS. STANLEY, MARK CORNELIUS

Case Summary

On 08/07/1998 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against STANLEY, MARK CORNELIUS. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeanette D Bigney. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************-A-O

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/1998

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Jeanette D Bigney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendants

MARK CORNELIUS STANLEY

MARK C STANLEY AKA

MEGUEL NAZARIO AKA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

RICHARD RHODES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

11/13/2009

FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 266.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/13/2009

FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: -266.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/23/2000

FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/23/2000

FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 256.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/30/1998

DocketBond Discharged; Comments: BOND DISCHARGED #A06-1190881

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/18/1998

HearingHearing: Hearing; Location: Document Icon

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/18/1998

DocketHEARING - Hearing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/18/1998

DocketDisposition

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/18/1998

DocketIn Open Court; Comments: IN OPEN COURT PLEA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/18/1998

DocketAppearance of Defendant Entered; Comments: APPEARANCE OF DEFENDANT ENTERED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
33 More Docket Entries
09/10/1998

HearingHearing: Arraignment; Location: Document Icon

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/10/1998

DocketHEARING - Arraignment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/10/1998

DocketIn Open Court; Comments: IN OPEN COURT ARRAIGNMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/10/1998

DocketAppearance of Defendant Entered; Comments: APPEARANCE OF DEFENDANT ENTERED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/10/1998

DocketPlea of Not Guilty Entered; Comments: PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ENTERED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/10/1998

DocketPer the Court:; Comments: TRIAL PERIOD 10/19 THRU 11/04/98

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/1998

DocketInformation Filed; Comments: INFORMATION FILED STATE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/1998

DocketPer the Court:; Comments: ALL STAR BAIL BOND RET 9/10/98 $500.00 #A61190881

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/1998

DocketComplaint; Comments: COMPLAINT FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/1998

DocketAdvice to Defendant, First Appearance; Comments: ADVICE TO DEFENDANT, FIRST APPEARANCE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less