This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 12/11/2020 at 01:21:41 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS. MILLS, EUGENE DANIEL

Case Summary

On 10/23/1996 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against MILLS, EUGENE DANIEL. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Elizabeth Gibson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************-A-O

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/1996

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Elizabeth Gibson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

EUGENE DANIEL MILLS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

OFFICE OF PUBLIC DEFENDER, ESQUIRE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

04/05/2000

FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: CONVGEN; Amount: -50.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2000

FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 50.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/05/2000

DocketPer the Court:; Comments: PD LIEN PAID IN FULL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/23/1998

DocketCorrespondence Re: ACS Completion; Comments: CORRESPONDENCE RE: ACS COMPLETION FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/20/1998

DocketIn Open Court; Comments: IN OPEN COURT HEARING (RJC)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/20/1998

DocketAppearance of Defendant Entered; Comments: APPEARANCE OF DEFENDANT ENTERED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/20/1998

DocketOrder; Comments: ORDER DISMISSING RJC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/19/1998

FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: CONVGEN; Amount: -10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/19/1998

FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 10.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/19/1998

FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: CONVGEN; Amount: -157.50

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
01/23/1997

DocketFinal Judgment; Comments: FINAL JUDGMENT - PD LIEN $50

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/23/1997

DocketSent:; Comments: SENTENCE - 100HRS ACS, FINE/COSTS - $167.50 BY (7/23/97), LETTER OF APOLOGY

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/15/1997

DocketState's Witness List; Comments: STATE'S WITNESS LIST FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/15/1997

DocketState's Response to Demand for Discovery; Comments: STATE'S RESPONSE FOR DISCOVERY FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/10/1997

DocketMotion to Compel; Comments: MOTION TO COMPEL FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/1997

DocketSubpoena Issued; Comments: SUBPOENA ISSUED* RET: 01/23/97 08:30a.m. (SA) (02)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/16/1996

DocketNotice for Trial; Comments: NOTICE OF TRIAL RTN:[01/23/97] @ 8:30 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/02/1996

DocketOrder to Transfer; Comments: ORDER TO TRANSFER FILED ME96-989

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/02/1996

DocketAffidavit of Insolvency and Indigency; Comments: AFF/INSOL FILED REF PD

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/02/1996

DocketPer the Court:; Comments: TRIAL DATE TO BE SET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less