This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 11/11/2020 at 10:13:29 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS. ESCOBEDO, ELIAS LEO

Case Summary

On 02/08/1995 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against ESCOBEDO, ELIAS LEO. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Apopka Branch located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Steve Jewett. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************-A-A

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/1995

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Steve Jewett

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

ELIAS LEO ESCOBEDO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

CHARLENE KELLEY

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/1995
  • DocketPer the Court:; Comments: FILED IN ORLANDO AS MO95-5127

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/1995
  • DocketIn Open Court; Comments: IN OPEN COURT ARG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/1995
  • DocketOrder to Transfer; Comments: ORDER TO TRANSFER FILED TO DIV. 64, JUDGE WALLACE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/1995
  • DocketNotice for Trial; Comments: NOTICE OF TRIAL RTN:TO BE SET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/1995
  • DocketDisposition Slip; Comments: DISPOSITION SLIP FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/1995
  • DocketBOND - Charge 1 Surety Bond X077511553

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/1995
  • DocketWritten Plea of Not Guilty; Comments: WRITTEN PLEA OF NOT GUILTY ENTERED BY CHARLENE KELLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/1995
  • DocketNotice of Inquiry; Comments: NOTICE OF ARGN ISSUED RET:[03/23/95]

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/1995
  • DocketBond Filed; Comments: COPY OF AA CASTELL-WAYLENE BOND $1000.00 RTN: 3/21/95

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/1995
  • DocketInformation Filed; Comments: INFORMATION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/1995
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comments: NOTICE OF HEARING FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/1995
  • DocketMotion; Comments: MOTION TO SET BAIL OR ROR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/1995
  • DocketMotion for Statement of Particulars; Comments: MOTION FOR STATEMENT OF PARTICULARS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/1995
  • DocketDemand for Discovery; Comments: DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/1995
  • DocketComplaint; Comments: COMPLAINT FILED-COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/1995
  • DocketIn Open Court; Comments: IN OPEN COURT IA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/1995
  • DocketAppearance of Defendant Entered; Comments: APPEARANCE OF DEFENDANT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/1995
  • DocketAdvice to Defendant, First Appearance; Comments: ADVICE TO DEFENDANT, FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/1995
  • DocketBond Filed; Comments: BOND SET AT NONE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/1995
  • DocketPer the Court:; Comments: DEF. ON PROBATION FOR SAME CHARGE

    Read MoreRead Less