This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 11/11/2020 at 15:25:59 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS. CARSON, MILTON

Case Summary

On 02/15/1995 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against CARSON, MILTON. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Apopka Branch located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Steve Jewett. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************-A-A

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/1995

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Steve Jewett

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

MILTON CARSON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/1997
  • DocketBOND - Charge 3 Surety Bond A06806130

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/1996
  • DocketIn Open Court; Comments: IN OPEN COURT (VOP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/1996
  • DocketAppearance of Defendant Entered; Comments: APPEARANCE OF DEFENDANT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/1996
  • DocketAppearance of Attorney Entered; Comments: APPEAR. OF ATTORNEY ENTERED * A 070896PG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/1996
  • DocketPlea of Guilty Entered; Comments: PLEA OF GUILTY ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/1996
  • DocketPer the Court:; Comments: PROBATION TERMINATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/1996
  • DocketSent:; Comments: SENTENCE 45 DAYS OCJ W/CR 3 DAYS T/S, 42 DAYS OCJ SUSP. IF COMPLETES ALL PREVIOUS IMPOSED CONDITIONS BY 3-10-97 W/PROOF TO CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/1996
  • DocketDisposition Slip; Comments: DISPOSITION SLIP FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/1996
  • DocketIn Open Court; Comments: IN OPEN COURT VOP ARRAIGNMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/1996
  • DocketAppearance of Defendant Entered; Comments: APPEARANCE OF DEFENDANT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 03/02/1995
  • DocketAppearance of Defendant Entered; Comments: APPEARANCE OF DEFENDANT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/1995
  • DocketReset; Comments: RESET IF STATE FILES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/1995
  • DocketDisposition Slip; Comments: DISPOSITION SLIP FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/1995
  • DocketComplaint; Comments: COMPLAINT FILED DOA: 2/11/95

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/1995
  • DocketBond Filed; Comments: COPY OF POLAKOFF BOND $2500.00 RTN: 3/2/95

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/1995
  • DocketIn Open Court; Comments: IN OPEN COURT (IA)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/1995
  • DocketAppearance of Defendant Entered; Comments: APPEARANCE OF DEFENDANT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/1995
  • DocketAdvice to Defendant, First Appearance; Comments: ADVICE TO DEFENDANT, FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/1995
  • DocketBond Filed; Comments: BOND SET @ $2500.00 W/COND NO CONTACT W/VICTIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/1995
  • DocketReferred to Public Defender (Temp); Comments: REFFERED TO PUBLIC DEFENDER (TEMP)

    Read MoreRead Less