This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 11/17/2020 at 13:38:19 (UTC).

STATE OF FLORIDA VS. BLUE, CHRISTOPHER DAVIE

Case Summary

On 06/28/1995 STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against BLUE, CHRISTOPHER DAVIE. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Winter Park Branch located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew L Cameron. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **************-A-E

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/1995

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Andrew L Cameron

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

CHRISTOPHER DAVIE BLUE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

OFFICE OF PUBLIC DEFENDER, ESQUIRE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2000
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2000
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 105.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2000
  • DocketOrder of Reassignment; Comments: Reassigned from division 61 to division 62

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/1995
  • DocketPlea; Comments: PLEA SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/1995
  • DocketDisposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/1995
  • DocketComplaint; Comments: COMPLAINT FILED DOA: 6/24/95

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/1995
  • DocketIn Open Court; Comments: IN OPEN COURT (IA) ON 6/25/95

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/1995
  • DocketAdvice to Defendant, First Appearance; Comments: ADVICE TO DEFENDANT, FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/1995
  • DocketReferred to Public Defender (Temp); Comments: REFFERED TO PUBLIC DEFENDER (TEMP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/1995
  • DocketBond $ Inmate #; Comments: BOND $250.00 INMATE #95-25153

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/1995
  • DocketIn Open Court; Comments: IN OPEN COURT (IN JAIL ARG) 6/27/95

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/1995
  • DocketAppearance of Defendant Entered; Comments: APPEARANCE OF DEFENDANT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/1995
  • DocketAffidavit of Insolvency and Indigency; Comments: AFF/INSOL FILED REF PD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/1995
  • DocketAppearance of Attorney Entered; Comments: APPEAR. OF ATTORNEY ENTERED PUBLIC DEFENDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/1995
  • DocketPlea of Nolo Contendere Entered; Comments: PLEA OF NOLO CONTENDERE ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/1995
  • DocketAdjudicated Guilty; Comments: ADJUDICATED GUILTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/1995
  • DocketSent:; Comments: SENTENCE *4 DAYS OCJ W/C 4 DAYS T/S. PAY CC OF $115.00 W/IN 6 MOS (10-27-95). RELEASE DEFT. AS TO THIS CASE ONLY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/1995
  • DocketCase Disposed at First Appearance; Comments: CASE DISPOSED AT FIRST APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/1995
  • DocketOrder of Disposition; Comments: ORDER OF DISPOSITON FILED & RECORDED

    Read MoreRead Less