This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 09/08/2019 at 11:29:51 (UTC).

SIMPSON, DEBORAH vs. OKEEFFEE, ANNet al.

Case Summary

On 07/12/2005 SIMPSON, DEBORAH filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against OKEEFFEE, ANN. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Kevin B. Weiss. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************12-O

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Kevin B. Weiss

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEBORAH SIMPSON

Defendants and Counter Defendants

THE HERTZ CORPORATION

KATHLEEN SMITH

ANN OKEEFFEE

Counter Plaintiffs and 3Rd Party Defendants

ANN O'KEEFFE

SARA SELESKY

ANN OKEEFFE

3Rd Party Plaintiff

HERTZ CORPORATION THE

Not Classified By Court

NONI SIMPSON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff, 3Rd Party Plaintiff, Counter Plaintiff and Not Classified By Court Attorney

MICHAEL HANSON

Defendant and 3Rd Party Defendant Attorneys

DENNIS O'CONNOR

MEGHAN SPENCER

SYLVIA GRUNOR

 

Court Documents

Order of Dismissal

Order of Dismissal

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

Motion/Notice and Judgment to Dismiss-Appear

Motion/Notice and Judgment to Dismiss-Appear; Comments: 06/02/2011 @ 8:30am

Order of Dismissal

Order of Dismissal; Comments: Order of Dismissal|ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO THE HERTZ CORPORATION AND KATHLEN SMITH (BE TWEEN SARA SELESKY AND HERTZ AND SMITH) (SENT TO RECORDING 11/18/08)

Letter

Letter; Comments: Letter|LETTER FILED FROM ATTORNEY ELIZABETH MCCAULAND

Letter

Letter; Comments: Letter|LETTER FILED FROM ATTORNEY JULIE L KELLY (SECRETARY)

Joint Stipulation for Dismissal

Joint Stipulation for Dismissal; Comments: Joint Stipulation for Dismissal|JOINT STIP FOR ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

Letter

Letter; Comments: Letter|LETTER TO JUDGE FROM ROGER HELMS

Notice of Service of Proposal for Settlement

Notice of Service of Proposal for Settlement; Comments: Notice of Service of Proposal for Settlement|NOTICE SERVICE OF JOINT PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT ON 9/11/08

Notice

Notice; Comments: Notice|NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT SERVED ON 8/26/08

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Taking Deposition(s); Comments: Notice of Taking Deposition|NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF MARC SHARFMAN, M.D. ON 09/23/08 @ 6:30 PM

Order

Order; Comments: Order|ORDER SETTING MEDIATION CONFERENCE FOR 9/30/08 AT 1PM

Order

Order; Comments: Order|AGREED ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL

Letter

Letter; Comments: Letter|LETTER FILED TO JUDGE FROM ELIZABETH F. MCCAUSLAND

Notice of Service of Proposal for Settlement

Notice of Service of Proposal for Settlement; Comments: Notice of Service of Proposal for Settlement|NOTICE SERVICE OF JOINT PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO COUNTER PLAINTIFF/THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT SARA SLESKY

Letter

Letter; Comments: Letter|LETTER TO JUDGE FROM ROGER D HELMS

Order Setting Pre-Trial Conference

Order Setting Pre-Trial Conference; Comments: Order Setting Pre-Trial Conference|UNIFORM ORDER SETTING CASE FOR JURY TRIAL (10/27/08) AND PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING PRETRIAL MATTERS TO BE COMPLETED ORDER FOR PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE 10/13/2008 11:00 A.M.; TRIAL ON 10/27/08 @ 11AM

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal; Comments: Voluntary Dismissal|VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO HERTZ CORPORATION AND KATHLEEN SMITH

61 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2011
  • DocketHEARING - Lack of Prosecution - Rodriguez, Jose R (Actual: Rodriguez, Jose R)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion/Notice and Judgment to Dismiss-Appear; Comments: 06/02/2011 @ 8:30am

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal; Comments: Order of Dismissal|ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO THE HERTZ CORPORATION AND KATHLEN SMITH (BE TWEEN SARA SELESKY AND HERTZ AND SMITH) (SENT TO RECORDING 11/18/08)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter; Comments: Letter|LETTER FILED FROM ATTORNEY ELIZABETH MCCAULAND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter; Comments: Letter|LETTER FILED FROM ATTORNEY JULIE L KELLY (SECRETARY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJoint Stipulation for Dismissal; Comments: Joint Stipulation for Dismissal|JOINT STIP FOR ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter; Comments: Letter|LETTER TO JUDGE FROM ROGER HELMS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Proposal for Settlement; Comments: Notice of Service of Proposal for Settlement|NOTICE SERVICE OF JOINT PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT ON 9/11/08

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
269 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2005
  • Docket20 Day Summons Issued; Comments: 20 Day Summons Issued|20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED (2); ORIG TO ILS FOLDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2005
  • DocketInitial Judge Assigned; Comments: Initial Judge Assigned|INITIAL JUDGE ASSIGNED BRONSON, THEOTIS 33

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2005
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Comments: Civil Cover Sheet|CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2005
  • DocketComplaint; Comments: Complaint|COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2007
  • DocketDescription: Payment; Payer: SIMPSON, DEBORAH; Amount: -2.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2007
  • DocketDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 2.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2007
  • DocketDescription: Payment; Payer: SIMPSON, DEBORAH; Amount: -7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2007
  • DocketDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 7.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2005
  • DocketDescription: Payment; Payer: SIMPSON, DEBORAH; Amount: -255.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2005
  • DocketDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 255.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Hertz Corporation is a litigant