This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 01/01/2020 at 19:43:28 (UTC).

SIGNATURE CONSULTANTS LLC vs. GILHULY, SEANet al.

Case Summary

On 01/21/2010 SIGNATURE CONSULTANTS LLC filed an Other - Injunction lawsuit against GILHULY, SEAN. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are John Marshall Kest and Chad K Alvaro. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************02-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Injunction

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

John Marshall Kest

Chad K Alvaro

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SIGNATURE CONSULTANTS LLC

Defendants

BILL PEPPLER

SEAN GILHULY

SKILLSTORM COMMERCIAL SERVICES LLC

SKILLSTORM INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROMIN CURRIER

Defendant Attorneys

JUAN LOPEZ-CAMPILLO

JOHN FINNIGAN

 

Court Documents

Court Minutes

Court Minutes; Comments: COURT MINUTES

Order of Dismissal

Order of Dismissal; Comments: sent to rec 12/5/11

Motion/Notice and Judgment to Dismiss-Appear

Motion/Notice and Judgment to Dismiss-Appear; Comments: 12/05/11 10:00 am

Motion/Notice and Judgment to Dismiss-Appear

Motion/Notice and Judgment to Dismiss-Appear; Comments: 12/05/11 10:00 am

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal

Notice of Voluntary Dismissal; Comments: JOINT Notice of Voluntary Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE

Exhibits in Support of

Exhibits in Support of; Comments: Exhibit in Support of JOINT NOTICE -- EXHIBIT A - AGREED ORDER DISMISSING CLAIMS

Order Granting

Order Granting; Comments: motion for entry of stipulated injunction; sent to rec 2/23/10

Motion

Motion; Comments: for entry of stipulated injunction

Motion

Motion; Comments: JOINT Motion FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED INJUNCTION

Exhibits in Support of

Exhibits in Support of; Comments: Exhibit in Support of JOINT MOTION FOR ENTRY OF STIPULATED INJUNCTION - EXHIBIT A

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Request

Request; Comments: for entry upon land for inpsection and photography

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: Notice Appearance of Counsel

Interrogatories

Interrogatories; Comments: AMENDED

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: AMENDED

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes; Comments: COURT MINUTES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal; Comments: sent to rec 12/5/11

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2011
  • DocketHEARING - Lack of Prosecution - Kirkwood, Lawrence R (Actual: Munyon, Lisa T.)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2011
  • DocketHEARING - Lack of Prosecution - Kirkwood, Lawrence R (Actual: Munyon, Lisa T.)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion/Notice and Judgment to Dismiss-Appear; Comments: 12/05/11 10:00 am

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion/Notice and Judgment to Dismiss-Appear; Comments: 12/05/11 10:00 am

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Voluntary Dismissal; Comments: JOINT Notice of Voluntary Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibits in Support of; Comments: Exhibit in Support of JOINT NOTICE -- EXHIBIT A - AGREED ORDER DISMISSING CLAIMS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion; Comments: EMERGENCY VERIFIED EX-PARTE MOTION FOR TEMPORARY INJUNCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2010
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Customer; Amount: -16.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/22/2010
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 16.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2010
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: CURRIER, ROMIN N; Amount: -1008.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2010
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 1008.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2010
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: CURRIER, ROMIN N; Amount: -440.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2010
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 40.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/21/2010
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Signature Consultants LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CURRIER , ROMIN N