This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 11/04/2021 at 05:38:34 (UTC).

REFLEXIONS INC, vs. TRULY NOLEN OF AMERICA INC, et al

Case Summary

On 01/08/1997 REFLEXIONS INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against TRULY NOLEN OF AMERICA INC. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Gisela T Laurent and Carly S Wish. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************72-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/1997

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Gisela T Laurent

Carly S Wish

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REFLEXIONS INC

Defendants

TRULY NOLEN OF AMERICA INC

TRULY NOLEN EXTERMINATING INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHARLES STEINBERG

Defendant Attorney

DANIEL GERBER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

02/11/1998

DocketOrder of Dismissal

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/11/1998

DocketOrder of Dismissal Before Hearing; Comments: Final Order of Dismissal Before Hearing|Order Dismissal Before Hearing Recorded

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/1998

DocketStipulation

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/1998

DocketJoint Stipulation; Comments: Joint Stipulation for|JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/1998

DocketLetter; Comments: Letter|LETTER TO: JUDGE FREEMAN FROM CHRISTOPHER T. HILL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/04/1997

DocketNotice of Taking Deposition(s); Comments: Notice of Taking Deposition|NTS TAK DEPO 9:30 9/26 DEFT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/1997

DocketAffidavit; Comments: Affidavit|AFFIDAVIT AS TO STANLEY KRUSE W/EXHS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/1997

DocketPer the Court:; Comments: Free|PLTF'S RESPONSE TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/1997

DocketMotion for Final Judgment; Comments: Motion for Final Judgment|MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT W/EXH

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/1997

DocketNotice of Taking Deposition(s); Comments: Notice of Taking Deposition|NTS TAK DEPO 9:30 8/15 DEFT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
07/23/1997

DocketLetter; Comments: Letter|LETTER TO: JUDGE LAUTEN FROM FRANK T. ALLEN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/09/1997

DocketMotion; Comments: Motion |MOTION TO AMEND ANSWER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/13/1997

DocketNotice; Comments: Notice|NOTICE OF ANSWER TO DEFT'S INTERROGATORIES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/1997

DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: Notice of Service of Interrogatories|NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO: PLTF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/1997

DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: Answer & Affirmative Defenses|ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/03/1997

DocketPer the Court:; Comments: Free|REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLTF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/27/1997

DocketSummons Returned; Comments: Summons Returned|20 DAY SUMMONS SRVD 1/14 RET 2/03

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/09/1997

Docket20 Day Summons Issued; Comments: 20 Day Summons Issued|20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED ORIG SHERIFF (BROWARD CTY)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/08/1997

DocketComplaint; Comments: Complaint|COMPLAINT W/EXHS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/08/1997

DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Comments: Civil Cover Sheet|CIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less