This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 09/11/2019 at 10:31:57 (UTC).

PHILLIPS, THOMAS CALVINet al. vs. WOLFE, DARINet al.

Case Summary

On 10/05/2005 PHILLIPS, THOMAS CALVIN filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against WOLFE, DARIN. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Lisa T. Munyon. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************86-O

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Lisa T. Munyon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ETHEL ELIZABETH PHILLIPS

THOMAS CALVIN PHILLIPS

Defendants

CARDIOLOGY ASSOCIATES OF ORLANDO PA

ROLAND A FILART

ORLANDO REGIONAL HEALTHCARE LUCERNE DBA

GEOFFREY MD STEWART

CENTRAL FLORIDA HOSPITALISTS PARTNERS PA

DARIN WOLFE

SPINE AND SCOLIOSIS CENTER PA

SCOTT D GREENWOOD

ORLANDO REGIONAL HEALTHCARE SYSTEMS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EDWARD PARKER

Defendant Attorneys

PAMELA PADILLA

RICHARDS FORD

ROBERT HENRY

KEVIN O'HARA

 

Court Documents

Order of Dismissal

Order of Dismissal

Letter

Letter

Joint Stipulation for Dismissal

Joint Stipulation for Dismissal

Order of Dismissal

Order of Dismissal

Letter

Letter

Uniform Order Setting Case for Jury/Pretrial

Uniform Order Setting Case for Jury/Pretrial; Comments: Pretrial 03/04/2013 @ 9:30 am

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

Motion to Amend

Motion to Amend; Comments: Affirmative Defenses

Exhibit List

Exhibit List

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Order of Dismissal

Order of Dismissal

Letter

Letter

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: proposal for settlement

383 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJoint Stipulation for Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUniform Order Setting Case for Jury/Pretrial; Comments: Pretrial 03/04/2013 @ 9:30 am

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2012
  • DocketHEARING - Case Management Conference - Mihok, A Thomas (Actual: Mihok, A Thomas)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2012
  • DocketHEARING - Case Management Conference - Mihok, A Thomas (Actual: Mihok, A Thomas)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
712 More Docket Entries
  • 12/22/2005
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: Answer & Affirmative Defenses|ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES DEFT ORLANDO REGIONAL HEALTHCARE SYSTEM INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2005
  • DocketWaiver; Comments: Waiver|PLTFS WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2005
  • DocketWaiver; Comments: Waiver|PHILLIPS WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2005
  • Docket20 Day Summons Issued; Comments: 20 Day Summons Issued|20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED (ORLANDO REGIONAL HEALTHCARE SYSTEMS INC DBA ORLANDO REGIONAL HEALTHCARE LUCERNE)- ORIG PL ATTY/RUNNER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2005
  • Docket20 Day Summons Issued; Comments: 20 Day Summons Issued|20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED (THE SPINE & SCOLIOSIS CENTER PA)- ORIG PL ATTY/RUNNER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2005
  • DocketInitial Judge Assigned; Comments: Initial Judge Assigned|INITIAL JUDGE ASSIGNED Thorpe, JANET C 40

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2005
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Comments: Civil Cover Sheet|CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/05/2005
  • DocketComplaint; Comments: Complaint|COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2005
  • DocketDescription: Payment; Payer: PHILLIPS, THOMAS CALVIN; Amount: -263.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2005
  • DocketDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 263.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CENTRAL FLORIDA HOSPITALIST PARTNERS PA is a litigant

Latest cases where ORLANDO REGIONAL HEALTHCARE SYSTEM INC FKA is a litigant

Latest cases where Cardiology Associates Medical Group is a litigant