This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 09/13/2019 at 23:15:20 (UTC).

ORANGE COUNTY FLORIDA vs. RODRIGUEZ, EUGENIOet al.

Case Summary

On 12/22/2005 ORANGE COUNTY FLORIDA filed a Property - Eminent Domain lawsuit against RODRIGUEZ, EUGENIO. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Janet C Thorpe and Keith A Carsten. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************35-O

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Eminent Domain

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Janet C Thorpe

Keith A Carsten

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ORANGE COUNTY FLORIDA

Defendants

MILTON A ROBINSON

EARL K WOOD

MICHAEL GREEN

JAMES P ROBINSON

PHUONG LY VAN

INDYMAC BANK FSB

WASHIGNTON MUTUAL BANK FA

NATIONSBANK NA AKA

FRANK J DOLCI

EUGENIO RODRIGUEZ

ARACELY RODRIGUEZ

THOMAS R JOKERST

ROSA I ROBINSON

Other

CONVERSION

Not Classified By Court

SR INVESTMENT INC DELAWARE CORP

HOMESIDE LENDING INC FLORIDA CORP

BARNETT BANK NA

Trustees

PHUONG LY VAN FAMILY TRUST DATED AUGUST 20 2002

TAI CHI VAN FAMILY TRUST DATED AUGUST 20 2002

3 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KATHERINE LOCKETT

Defendant and Trustee Attorneys

D NATIRBOFF

BRADLEY GOULD

THOMAS CALLAN

PRINEET SHARMA

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal

Order Setting Hearing

Order Setting Hearing; Comments: (Status) 8/17/2012 at 1:30 PM

Disposal Listing

Disposal Listing

Notice of Disposal of Exhibits

Notice of Disposal of Exhibits

Final Disposition Form

Final Disposition Form

Final Judgment

Final Judgment; Comments: Final Judgment|PARCEL 1242 STIPULATED FINAL JUDGMENT (DOES NOT PETITIONER TO DEPOSIT MONEY OR CLERK TO DISBURSE) ***TAI CHI VAN***

Final Judgment

Final Judgment; Comments: Final Judgment|PARCELS 1243, 8243 STIPULATED FINAL JUDGMENT PETITIONER SHALL PAY $22,100.00 TO FRANK DOLCI & $14,191.95 TO TRUST ACCOUNT OF THOMAS CALLAN PA DIRECTLY ***FRANK DOLCI*** (DOES NOT DIRECT CLERK OR MENTION REGISTRY)

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce; Comments: Response to Request to Produce|DEFT FRANK J DOLCI RESPONSE TO PLTFS SECOND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

Letter

Letter; Comments: Letter|LETTER FILED TO CLERK BY KATHRYN GRACE

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce; Comments: Response to Request to Produce|TAI CHI VAN'S RESPONSE TO SECOND REQUEST TO PRODUCE

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: Request to Produce|SECOND REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO FRANK DOLCI

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: Request to Produce|SECOND REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO TAI CHI VAN & PHUONG LY VAN

Notice of Unavailability

Notice of Unavailability; Comments: Notice of Unavailability|NOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY FOR DEFTS COUNSEL FROM 6/07/07-6/17/07

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce; Comments: Response to Request to Produce|RESPONSE TO PETITIONER'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce; Comments: Response to Request to Produce|DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO PETITIONER'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE OF DOCUMENTS

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: Request to Produce|PLTFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO TAI CHI VAN & PHUONG LY VAN

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: Request to Produce|PLTFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO FRANK J DOLCI

Final Judgment

Final Judgment; Comments: Final Judgment|PARCELS 1260/7260 STIPULATED FINAL JUDGMENT PETITIONER SHALL DIRECTLY PAY $92,600.00 TO HARRIS, HARRIS BAUERLE & SHARMA TRUST TRUST ACCOUNT (DOES NOT MENTION OR DIRECT CLERK TO DISBURSE) ***ROSA ROBINSON***

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Voluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Voluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Setting Hearing; Comments: (Status) 8/17/2012 at 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Disposal Listing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Disposal of Exhibits

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Disposition Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Disposition Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2009
  • Term Bill Registry Fee - Orange County; Comments: Registry Fee - Orange County|REGISTRY FEE - ORANGE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2009
  • Deposit into Registry of Court; Comments: Deposit Into Registry of Court |DEPOSITED INTO REGISTRY PARCEL 1242

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2009
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Judgment; Comments: Final Judgment|PARCEL 1242 STIPULATED FINAL JUDGMENT (DOES NOT PETITIONER TO DEPOSIT MONEY OR CLERK TO DISBURSE) ***TAI CHI VAN***

    Read MoreRead Less
162 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2006
  • Description: Payment; Payer: CONVGEN; Amount: -27145.63

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2006
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 27145.63

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2006
  • Description: Payment; Payer: CONVGEN; Amount: -228514.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2006
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 228514.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2006
  • Description: Payment; Payer: CONVGEN; Amount: -1400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2006
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 1400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2006
  • Description: Payment; Payer: CONVGEN; Amount: -7900.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2006
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 7900.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2006
  • Description: Payment; Payer: CONVGEN; Amount: -36900.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2006
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 36900.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nationsbank (na) is a litigant

Latest cases where BancBoston Mortgage Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where BARNETT BANK, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where INDYMAC BANK, F.S.B. is a litigant