This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 07/19/2019 at 12:03:20 (UTC).

NELSON-MARSHALL, TRESHA vs. MARSHALL, ERNEST

Case Summary

On 09/07/2007 NELSON-MARSHALL, TRESHA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MARSHALL, ERNEST. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Donald A Myers. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************37-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2007

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Donald A Myers

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TRESHA NELSON-MARSHALL

Respondent

ERNEST MARSHALL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

11/08/2007

DocketFinal Judgment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2007

DocketHEARING - Status Hearing - Thorpe, Janet C

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2007

DocketHEARING - Status Hearing - Roche, Renee A

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2007

DocketDisposed by Judge

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2007

DocketFinal Judgment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2007

DocketDisposition Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2007

DocketCourt Minutes

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2007

DocketNotice of Hearing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/22/2007

DocketDefault Entered by the Clerk

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/22/2007

DocketMotion for Default

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
09/07/2007

DocketNotice of Social Security

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2007

DocketDisclosure from NonLawyer

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2007

DocketCopy of Drivers License

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2007

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2007

DocketPetition

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2007

DocketInitial Judge Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2007

DocketDescription: Payment; Payer: NELSON-MARSHALL, TRESHA; Amount: -3.50

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/08/2007

DocketDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 3.50

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2007

DocketDescription: Payment; Payer: NELSON-MARSHALL, TRESHA; Amount: -363.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/07/2007

DocketDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 363.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less