This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 09/05/2019 at 12:00:12 (UTC).

MATTESON, JUNE et al vs. THE ROMANO GROUP INC, et al

Case Summary

On 04/15/2005 MATTESON, JUNE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against THE ROMANO GROUP INC,. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Luis F Calderon. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************82-O

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Luis F Calderon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Guardian Ad Litems

DYLAN FISH

JUNE MATTESON

GRICELA VILAR

DYLAN FISH AKA

JUNE NICOLE MATTESON

DYLAN MATTESON

Defendants

FATHER & SON MOVING AND STORAGE OF BREVARD COUNTY

TCF LEASING INC

FATHER & S ON MOVING & STORAGE OF BREVARD COUNTY DBA

THE ROMANO GROUP INC

FATHER & SON MOVING & STORAGE OF BREVARD COUNTY IN DBA

Guardian Ad Litems and Plaintiffs

JUNE MATTESON

JUNE NICOLE MATTESON

Other

CONVERSION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

DON MCKEEVER

JOHN OVERCHUCK

Defendant Attorneys

GRIFFITH WINTHROP

S CHRISTOPHER

CHISTOPHER MORIN

 

Court Documents

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal; Comments: Voluntary Dismissal|VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

Motion

Motion; Comments: Motion |PLAINTIFF'S PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT ON BEHALF OF A MINOR CHILD W/ATTACHMENTS **SEALED & PLACED ON CIVIL RENTENTION SHELF-SEALED FILES 10/26/07**

Letter

Letter; Comments: Letter|LETTER TO JUDGE FROM DON MCKEEVER

Amended Notice of Hearing

Amended Notice of Hearing; Comments: Amended Notice of Hearing|AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING 9/28/2007 AT 10:00 AM

Report of Guardian Ad Litem

Report of Guardian Ad Litem; Comments: Report of Guardian Ad Litem|REPORT GUARDIAN AD LITEM **SEALED & PLACED ON CIVIL RETENTION SHELF-SEALED FILES 9/28/07**

Amended Notice of Hearing

Amended Notice of Hearing; Comments: Amended Notice of Hearing|AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING 09/28/2007 10:00 A.M.

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comments: Notice of Hearing|NOTICE OF HEARING * 09/24/2007 10:00 A.M.

Order to Seal Document

Order to Seal Document; Comments: Order to Seal Document|ORDER TO SEAL DOCUMENT: PETITION FOR SETTLEMENT APPROVAL AND THE GUARDIAN AD LITEM REPORT

Motion to Seal Document(s)

Motion to Seal Document(s); Comments: Motion to Seal Document(s)|JUNE NICOLE MATTESON MOTION TO SEAL DOCUMENTS; PETITION FOR SETTLEMENT APPROVAL AND THE GUARDIAN AD LITEM REPORT

Mediation Report

Mediation Report; Comments: Mediation Report|MEDIATORS REPORT TO THE COURT

Notice of Cancellation of Deposition

Notice of Cancellation of Deposition; Comments: Notice of Cancellation of Deposition|NOTICE OF CANCELLATION TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF CARL BARR, M.D. ON 09/14/07 @ 10:00 AM BY ATTORNEY FOR TCF LEASING, INC.

Notice of Cancellation of Deposition

Notice of Cancellation of Deposition; Comments: Notice of Cancellation of Deposition|NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF JUAN RICHARDS, M.D. ON 09/10/07 @ 10:00 AM BY ATTORNEY FOR TCF LEASING, INC.

Notice of Cancellation of Deposition

Notice of Cancellation of Deposition; Comments: Notice of Cancellation of Deposition|NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF HEIDI NAPOLITANO, PH.D. ON 08/27/07 @ 9:30 AM BY ATTORNEY FOR TCF LEASING, INC.

Notice of Cancellation of Deposition

Notice of Cancellation of Deposition; Comments: Notice of Cancellation of Deposition|NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF ROBERT MURRAH, M.D. ON 08/29/07 @ 3:00 PM BY ATTORNEY FOR TCF LEASING, INC.

Notice of Cancellation of Deposition

Notice of Cancellation of Deposition; Comments: Notice of Cancellation of Deposition|NOTICE OF CANCELATION OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF ALEXANDER JUNGREIS, M.D. ON 09/21/07 @ 2:30 PM BY ATTORNEY FOR TCF LEASING, INC

Notice of Cancellation of Deposition

Notice of Cancellation of Deposition; Comments: Notice of Cancellation of Deposition|NOTICE OF CANCELATION TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF WADIH MACKSOUD, M.D. ON 10/04/07 @ 5:00 PM BY ATTORNEY FOR TCF LEASING, INC.

Notice of Cancellation of Deposition

Notice of Cancellation of Deposition; Comments: Notice of Cancellation of Deposition|NOTICE OF CANCELATION OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF PATRICK GORMAN, M.D. ON 09/21/07 @ 10:00 AM BY ATTORNEY FOR TCF LEASING, INC.

Notice of Cancellation of Deposition

Notice of Cancellation of Deposition; Comments: Notice of Cancellation of Deposition|NOTICE OF CANCELATION OF DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM ON ROBERT CAMBRIDGE, M.D. ON 09/27/07 @ 1:00 PM BY ATTORNEY FOR TCF LEASING, INC.

102 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2007
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal; Comments: Voluntary Dismissal|VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion; Comments: Motion |PLAINTIFF'S PETITION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT ON BEHALF OF A MINOR CHILD W/ATTACHMENTS **SEALED & PLACED ON CIVIL RENTENTION SHELF-SEALED FILES 10/26/07**

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter; Comments: Letter|LETTER TO JUDGE FROM DON MCKEEVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Notice of Hearing; Comments: Amended Notice of Hearing|AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING 9/28/2007 AT 10:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReport of Guardian Ad Litem; Comments: Report of Guardian Ad Litem|REPORT GUARDIAN AD LITEM **SEALED & PLACED ON CIVIL RETENTION SHELF-SEALED FILES 9/28/07**

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Notice of Hearing; Comments: Amended Notice of Hearing|AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING 09/28/2007 10:00 A.M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Hearing; Comments: Notice of Hearing|NOTICE OF HEARING * 09/24/2007 10:00 A.M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/11/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder to Seal Document; Comments: Order to Seal Document|ORDER TO SEAL DOCUMENT: PETITION FOR SETTLEMENT APPROVAL AND THE GUARDIAN AD LITEM REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/10/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Seal Document(s); Comments: Motion to Seal Document(s)|JUNE NICOLE MATTESON MOTION TO SEAL DOCUMENTS; PETITION FOR SETTLEMENT APPROVAL AND THE GUARDIAN AD LITEM REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
215 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2005
  • DocketSummons Returned; Comments: Summons Returned|20 DAY SUMMONS SRVD [05/16/2005] THE ROMANO GROUP, JOHN ROMANO

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2005
  • DocketSummons Returned; Comments: Summons Returned|20 DAY SUMMONS SRVD [05/16/2005] FATHER & SON MOVING & STORAGE OF BREVARD CTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/22/2005
  • Docket20 Day Summons Issued; Comments: 20 Day Summons Issued|20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO ALL DEFTS (MAILED TO ATTY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2005
  • DocketInitial Judge Assigned; Comments: Initial Judge Assigned|INITIAL JUDGE ASSIGNED GRINCEWICZ, D E 34

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2005
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Comments: Civil Cover Sheet|CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2005
  • DocketComplaint; Comments: Complaint|COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2006
  • DocketDescription: Payment; Payer: CONVGEN; Amount: -9.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2006
  • DocketDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 9.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2005
  • DocketDescription: Payment; Payer: MATTESON, JUNE; Amount: -255.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2005
  • DocketDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 255.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROMANO GROUP, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where FATHER & SON MOVING AND STORAGE OF BREVARD COUNTY is a litigant

Latest cases where TCF EQUIPMENT FINANCE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GRIFFITH WINTHROP