This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 06/14/2022 at 11:55:31 (UTC).

MAHON, GARY M vs. FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE AND CONSUMER SER

Case Summary

On 11/20/2008 MAHON, GARY M filed an Other lawsuit against FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE AND CONSUMER SER. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Keith F White, Kevin B. Weiss and Denise Kim Beamer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************36-O

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2008

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Keith F White

Kevin B. Weiss

Denise Kim Beamer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

POKEYS LAKE GEM CITRUS NURSERY DBA

GARY M MAHON

Defendant

FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE AND CONSUMER SER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAM WILLIAMS

Defendant Attorney

WESLEY PARSONS

 

Court Documents

Evidence Control Sheet

Evidence Control Sheet

Instructions to Jury

Instructions to Jury

Verdict

Verdict

Minutes Jury

Minutes Jury

Instructions

Instructions; Comments: ADDITIONAL PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS

Instructions

Instructions; Comments: JURY INSTRUCTIONS

Response

Response

Instructions

Instructions; Comments: PROPOSED JURY INSTRUCTIONS ON GROWING OF LINERS TO MATURITY

Motion for Reconsideration

Motion for Reconsideration

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: REVISED PROPOSED VERDICT FORM (ATTACHED)

Correspondence

Correspondence; Comments: Defense Proffer #2

Correspondence

Correspondence; Comments: Stop Sale Notice & Hold Order

Memorandum

Memorandum

Instructions

Instructions; Comments: jury additional proposed

Witness and Exhibit List

Witness and Exhibit List; Comments: AMENDED

Questions from Jury

Questions from Jury; Comments: (No Given)

Motion In Limine

Motion In Limine; Comments: AS TO TIMOTHY SCHUBERTS POWER POINT

Instructions

Instructions; Comments: AND VERDICT FORMS

568 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEvidence Control Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • HearingHearing: Jury Trial - Beamer, Denise Kim (Actual: Beamer, Denise Kim); Location: Hearing Room 1700.02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • HearingHearing: Jury Trial - Beamer, Denise Kim (Actual: Beamer, Denise Kim); Location: Room 19-B on the 19th Floor

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInstructions to Jury

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVerdict

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMinutes Jury

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketHEARING - Jury Trial - Beamer, Denise Kim (Actual: Beamer, Denise Kim)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketHEARING - Jury Trial - Beamer, Denise Kim (Actual: Beamer, Denise Kim)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • HearingHearing: Jury Trial - Beamer, Denise Kim (Actual: Beamer, Denise Kim); Location: Hearing Room 1700.02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • HearingHearing: Jury Trial - Beamer, Denise Kim (Actual: Beamer, Denise Kim); Location: Room 19-B on the 19th Floor

    Read MoreRead Less
713 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2008
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: MAHON, GARY M; Amount: -35.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2008
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 35.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2008
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: MAHON, GARY M; Amount: -35.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2008
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 35.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2008
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: MAHON, GARY M; Amount: -310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2008
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2008
  • Docket20 Day Summons Issued; Comments: 20 Day Summons Issued|20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED- ALL CARITHERS PROCESS SERVICE/HAND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Comments: Civil Cover Sheet|CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint; Comments: Complaint|COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2008
  • DocketInitial Judge Assigned; Comments: Initial Judge Assigned|INITIAL JUDGE ASSIGNED SPRINKEL, G A IV 33

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF AGRICULTURE AND CONSUMER SER is a litigant