This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 07/30/2019 at 12:10:44 (UTC).

INTERBANC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC, vs. RANDAZZO, BEVERLY

Case Summary

On 04/25/2002 INTERBANC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC, filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RANDAZZO, BEVERLY. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Elizabeth J Starr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************84-O

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2002

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Elizabeth J Starr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INTERBANC MORTGAGE SERVICES INC

Defendant

BEVERLY RANDAZZO

Garnishee

BALLEN MORTAGE CORP

Other

CONVERSION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEVEN LABRET

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

12/01/2003

DocketSatisfaction of Judgment; Comments: Satisfaction of Judgment|SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT RECORDED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/01/2003

DocketSatisfaction of Judgment; Comments: Satisfaction of Judgment|SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT RECORDED AGAINST GARNISHEE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/24/2003

DocketFinal Judgment; Comments: Final Judgment|FINAL JUDGMENT IN GARNISHMENT RECORDED ON THE PLEADINGS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/12/2003

DocketFinal Judgment; Comments: Final Judgment|FINAL JUDGMENT IN GARNISHMENT RECORDED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/03/2003

DocketNotice of Hearing; Comments: Notice of Hearing|NOTICE OF HEARING [06/12/2003] @ 9:00 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2003

DocketNotice of Hearing; Comments: Notice of Hearing|NOTICE OF HEARING [05/27/2003] @ 9:00 AM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2003

DocketCase Reopened Close on Re-Open Main #10; Comments: ***Case Reopened***Close on Re-Open Maintain #10***|****CASE RE-OPENED****CLOSE ON RE-OPEN MAINT #10**

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2003

DocketMotion for Final Judgment; Comments: Motion for Final Judgment|MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/30/2003

DocketCertificate of Service; Comments: Certificate of Service|SECOND NOTICE TO DEFT & CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/28/2003

DocketAmended Answer; Comments: Amended Answer|AMENDED ANSWER OF GARNISHEE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
05/30/2002

DocketNotice to Appear; Comments: Notice to Appear|NOTICE TO APPEAR RETURNED SERVED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/30/2002

DocketSummary of Proceedings; Comments: Summary of Proceedings|SUMMARY OF PROCEEDINGS BY CLERK

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2002

DocketNotice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: Notice to Appear Scheduled for|NOTICE TO APPEAR ISSUED 05/30/2002 9:00 A.M.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2002

DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Comments: Civil Cover Sheet|CIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2002

DocketStatement of Claim; Comments: Statement of Claim|STATEMENT OF CLAIM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/25/2002

DocketInitial Judge Assigned; Comments: Initial Judge Assigned|INITIAL JUDGE ASSIGNED MILLER, W M 70

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2003

DocketDescription: Payment; Payer: CONVGEN; Amount: -162.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2003

DocketDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 162.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/15/2003

DocketDescription: Payment; Payer: INTERBANC MORTGAGE SERVICES IN; Amount: -6.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/15/2003

DocketDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 6.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less