This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 08/13/2019 at 12:45:26 (UTC).

ELKINS CONSTRUCTORS INC vs. ORLANDO VOLLEYBALL ACADEMYet al.

Case Summary

On 06/12/2003 ELKINS CONSTRUCTORS INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ORLANDO VOLLEYBALL ACADEMY. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Donald A Myers and Patricia L Strowbridge. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************07-O

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2003

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Donald A Myers

Patricia L Strowbridge

 

Party Details

Defendants

DAVID SMITH

SEMSCO DBA

ORLANDO ROCK & SEALING CORP

GARY GLOER

CEMEX INC

BAKER CONCRETE CONSTRUCTION INC

CEMEX CONSTRUCTION MATERIALS

CONTRACT CONSULTANTS INC DBA

AMBER ELECTRIC INC

VARCO PRUDEN BUILDINGS INC

A 1 SEPTIC SERVICE INC DBA

BRETT LINDQUIST

CONTRACT CONSULTANTS OF CENTRAL FLORIDA INC

L P CLAYTON GROUP INC

Cross Defendants

MILLENNIUM WOMAN INTERNATIONAL SPORTS CENTER INC

MILLENNIUM WOMAN FOUNDATION INC

Garnishees

CHARLES W. PRICE

OF AMERICA BANK

WACHOVIA BANK

Other

CONVERSION

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

HOUSTON SHORT

JAMES CUNNINGHAM

BARRY KALMANSON

TIMOTHY MOOREHEAD

CURTIS BROWN

AUGUST STANTON

Other Attorneys

JOHN CAVEN

MICHAEL YATES

RAY GARCIA

 

Court Documents

Returned Mail

Returned Mail; Comments: Order of Dismissal

Order of Dismissal

Order of Dismissal

Certificate of No Disbursement

Certificate of No Disbursement; Comments: Certificate of No Disbursement|CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT

Certificate of Title

Certificate of Title; Comments: Certificate of Title|CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

Certificate of Sale

Certificate of Sale; Comments: Certificate of Sale|CERTIFICATE OF SALE

Assignment of Judgment

Assignment of Judgment; Comments: Assignment of Judgment|NOTICE OF CORRECTIVE ASSIGNMENT OF JUDGMENT

Notice of Sale 1 Publish

Notice of Sale 1 Publish; Comments: Notice of Sale 1 Publish|NOTICE OF SALE 1 PUBLISH 09/16/2008 11:00 A.M. COPY TO ORLANDO SENTINEL & ALL PARTIES

Letter

Letter; Comments: Letter|LETTER FILED FROM JOHN B. KENT

Affidavit

Affidavit; Comments: Affidavit|AFFIDAVIT OF PERSONAL KNOWLEDGE

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comments: Notice of Hearing|NOTICE OF HEARING * 08/06/2008 01:30 P.M.

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: Notice of Filing|PLTFS NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVITS OF PLTFS ATTY AS TO FEES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE & FOR DAMAGES & AFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLENESS AS TO ATTYS FEES

Letter

Letter; Comments: Letter|LETTER FILED TO CLERK FROM KAREN D PENNINGTON

Letter

Letter; Comments: Letter|LETTER FILED FROM ATTORNEY KAREN D PENNINGTON

Affidavit of Costs

Affidavit of Costs; Comments: Affidavit of Costs|AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND FOR DAMAGES

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: Notice of Filing|PLTF NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVITS IN SUPPORT OF PLTF ELKINS CONSTRUCTORS INC MOTION FOR FINAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND FOR DAMAGES

Response

Response; Comments: Response|RESPONSE TO NOTICE OF LACK OF PROSECUTION/COURT'S MOTION TO DISMISS/ NOTICE OF HEARING BY THE PLAINTIFF FAX

Letter

Letter; Comments: Letter|LETTER FILED TO CLERK BY KAREN D PENNINGTON FAX

Letter

Letter; Comments: Letter|LETTER FILED FROM ATTORNEY

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Returned Mail; Comments: Order of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Order of Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2013
  • HEARING - Dismissal - Myers, Donald A, JR (Actual: Myers, Donald A, JR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2013
  • HEARING - Dismissal - Myers, Donald A, JR (Actual: Myers, Donald A, JR)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice; Comments: of lack of prosecution/motion to dismiss/notice of hrg

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Title; Comments: Certificate of Title|CORRECTED CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of No Disbursement; Comments: Certificate of No Disbursement|CERTIFICATE OF NO DISBURSEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2008
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Title; Comments: Certificate of Title|CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2008
  • Per the Court:; Comments: Free|*** TITLE NEEDS TO BE ISSUED TO ECNP, INC.***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2008
  • HEARING - Notice of Sale - Notice of Sale, Notice of Sale

    Read MoreRead Less
431 More Docket Entries
  • 05/13/2004
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: -163.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2004
  • Description: Payment; Payer: CONVGEN; Amount: -326.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2004
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 326.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2004
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2004
  • Description: Payment; Payer: CONVGEN; Amount: -163.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2004
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 163.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2004
  • Description: Payment; Payer: ELKINS CONSTRUCTORS INC; Amount: -7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2004
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2003
  • Description: Payment; Payer: ELKINS CONSTRUCTORS INC; Amount: -151.75

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2003
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 151.75

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Varco Pruden Buildings, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Cemex Construction Materials Atlantic, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where American Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where Baker Concrete Construction, Inc., is a litigant