This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 09/24/2019 at 11:05:46 (UTC).

DUNBROOKE APPAREL CORPORATION, vs. HARRIS, MATTHEW E

Case Summary

On 03/16/2006 DUNBROOKE APPAREL CORPORATION, filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HARRIS, MATTHEW E. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Faye L Allen. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************92-O

  • Filing Date:

    03/16/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Faye L Allen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DUNBROOKE APPAREL CORPORATION

Defendants

PROMO GROUP DBA

MATTHEW E HARRIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GILBERT SINGER

 

Court Documents

Notice to Appear

Notice to Appear; Comments: Notice to Appear|NOTICE TO APPEAR RETURNED UNSERVED AS TO HARRIS, MATTHEW E

Affidavit Proof of Claim

Affidavit Proof of Claim; Comments: Affidavit Proof of Claim|AFFIDAVIT PROOF OF CLAIM & NON-MILITARY SERVICE

Alias Notice to Appear Returned Unserved

Alias Notice to Appear Returned Unserved; Comments: Alias Notice to Appear Returned Unserved|ALIAS NOTICE TO APPEAR RETURNED UNSERVED AS TO HARRIS, MATTHEW E

Notice to Appear

Notice to Appear; Comments: Notice to Appear|PLURIES NOTICE TO APPEAR RET SRVD AS TO HARRIS, MATTHEW E

Summary of Proceedings

Summary of Proceedings; Comments: Summary of Proceedings|SUMMARY OF PROCEEDINGS BY CLERK

Stipulation (Case Closing)

Stipulation (Case Closing); Comments: Stipulation (Case Closing)|STIPULATION (CASE CLOSING) BEFORE HEARING

Letter

Letter; Comments: Letter|LETTER FILED FROM ATTORNEY GILBERT M SINGER

Affidavit of Non Payment

Affidavit of Non Payment; Comments: Affidavit of Non Payment|AFFIDAVIT OF NON PAYMENT

Disposition Sheet

Disposition Sheet; Comments: Disposition Sheet |DISPOSITION SHEET FILED

Letter by Clerk (Check Returned Not Required)

Letter by Clerk (Check Returned Not Required); Comments: Letter by Clerk (Check Returned Not Required)|LETTER BY CLERK ($50 CHECK RETURNED NOT REQUIRED)

Final Judgment

Final Judgment; Comments: Final Judgment|FINAL JUDGMENT AFTER STIPULATION AGAINST HARRIS, MATTHEW E

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Taking Deposition(s); Comments: Notice of Taking Deposition|NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF MATTHEW E HARRIS, 9/5/07, 2:45

Subpoena Duces Tecum for Deposition Returned to

Subpoena Duces Tecum for Deposition Returned to; Comments: Subpoena Duces Tecum for Deposition Returned|SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM DEPO UNSERVED MATTHEW E HARRIS

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

09/17/2007
View Court Documents

DocketSubpoena Duces Tecum for Deposition Returned to; Comments: Subpoena Duces Tecum for Deposition Returned|SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM DEPO UNSERVED MATTHEW E HARRIS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/07/2007
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Taking Deposition(s); Comments: Notice of Taking Deposition|NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION OF MATTHEW E HARRIS, 9/5/07, 2:45

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2007

DocketCertified Copy Issued; Comments: Certified Copy Issued|CC OF FINAL JUDGMENT TO RECORDING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2007

DocketFinal Judgment

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2007
View Court Documents

DocketFinal Judgment; Comments: Final Judgment|FINAL JUDGMENT AFTER STIPULATION AGAINST HARRIS, MATTHEW E

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2007
View Court Documents

DocketLetter by Clerk (Check Returned Not Required); Comments: Letter by Clerk (Check Returned Not Required)|LETTER BY CLERK ($50 CHECK RETURNED NOT REQUIRED)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2007
View Court Documents

DocketDisposition Sheet; Comments: Disposition Sheet |DISPOSITION SHEET FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2007
View Court Documents

DocketAffidavit of Non Payment; Comments: Affidavit of Non Payment|AFFIDAVIT OF NON PAYMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2007
View Court Documents

DocketLetter; Comments: Letter|LETTER FILED FROM ATTORNEY GILBERT M SINGER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2007

DocketCase Reopened Close on Re-Open Main #10; Comments: ***Case Reopened***Close on Re-Open Maintain #10***|****CASE RE-OPENED****CLOSE ON RE-OPEN MAINT #10**

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
22 More Docket Entries
05/04/2006

DocketSummary of Proceedings; Comments: Summary of Proceedings|SUMMARY OF PROCEEDINGS/NO PROOF OF SERVICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2006

DocketNotice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: Notice to Appear Scheduled for|NOTICE TO APPEAR ISSUED 05/04/2006 08:30 A.M. ORIGINAL AND COPIES TO ATTY.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2006

DocketInitial Judge Assigned; Comments: Initial Judge Assigned|INITIAL JUDGE ASSIGNED TO BE ASSIGNED 72

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2006

DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Comments: Civil Cover Sheet|CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2006

DocketMotion; Comments: Motion |MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF PROCESS SERVER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/16/2006

DocketStatement of Claim; Comments: Statement of Claim|STATEMENT OF CLAIM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2007

DocketDescription: Payment; Payer: DUNBROOKE APPAREL CORPORATION; Amount: -2.50

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2007

DocketDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 2.50

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2006

DocketDescription: Payment; Payer: DUNBROOKE APPAREL CORPORATION; Amount: -155.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/17/2006

DocketDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 155.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less