This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 08/27/2019 at 00:51:51 (UTC).

CASSARO, PATRICK et al vs. PURDUE PHARMA LP, et al

Case Summary

On 07/15/2004 CASSARO, PATRICK filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against PURDUE PHARMA LP,. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Chad K Alvaro. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************71-O

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2004

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Chad K Alvaro

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PATRICK CASSARO

LYDIA CASSARO

Defendants

PURDUE PHARMA INC

ABBOTT LABORATORIES

ABBOTT LABORATORIES INC

PURDUE PHARMA LP

PHYSICAL MEDICINE PAIN CENTER PA DBA

PARDUE PHARMACEUTICALS LP

THE P F LABORATORIES INC

THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY

JAMES K SHEA MD PA

FRANCIS W BROOKS DO

JAMES K SHEA MD INC

PRA HOLDINGS INC

ABBOTT SALES MARKETING AND DISTRIBUTING COMPANY DBA

JAMES K SHEA MD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL RYAN

Defendant Attorneys

AMY BLOOM

STEVEN ROTHMAN

ROBERT MANSBACH

STEPHEN SAMBOL

 

Court Documents

Final Order of Dismissal After Hearing

Final Order of Dismissal After Hearing; Comments: Final Order of Dismissal After Hearing|FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL - AFTER HEARING WITH PREJUDICE; CLERK IS ORDERED TO REMOVE THIS ACTION FROM THE DOCKET

Voluntary Dismissal

Voluntary Dismissal; Comments: Voluntary Dismissal|NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY FOR AN DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

Objection

Objection; Comments: Objection|OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES OF THE PURDUE DEFENDANTS TO PLAINTIFFS THIRD REQUEST TO PRODUCE DATED JANUARY 31 2007

Notice of Cancellation of Deposition

Notice of Cancellation of Deposition; Comments: Notice of Cancellation of Deposition|NOTICE CANC OF DEPO OF DR CREAMER 3/21 @ 9:00 AM

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Reply to Affirmative Defenses; Comments: Reply to Affirmative Defenses |PLTFS REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY PURDUE DEFTS 2/07/07

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Reply to Affirmative Defenses; Comments: Reply to Affirmative Defenses |PLTFS REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY PURDUE DEFTS 2/08/07

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: Answer & Affirmative Defenses|DEFTS ABBOTT LABORATORIES & ABBOTT LABORATORIES INC ANSWER & DEFENSES REQUEST FOR RELIEF & JURY DEMAND

Answer

Answer; Comments: Answer|DEFT PURDUE PHARMA INC ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Answer

Answer; Comments: Answer|DEFT THE PURDUE FREDERICK CO ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Answer

Answer; Comments: Answer|DEFT PRA HOLDINGS INC ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Answer

Answer; Comments: Answer|DEFT PURDUE PHARMACEUTICALS L.P. ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Answer

Answer; Comments: Answer|DEFT PURDUE PHARMA L.P. ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Answer

Answer; Comments: Answer|DEFT THE P.F. LABORATORIES INC ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: Request to Produce|THIRD REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PURDUE DEFTS

Compliance with Request for Copies

Compliance with Request for Copies; Comments: Compliance With Request for Copies|DEFENDANTS FRANCIS W BROOKS DO NOTICE OF PARTIAL COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES

Compliance with Request for Copies

Compliance with Request for Copies; Comments: Compliance With Request for Copies|DEFENDANTS FRANCIS W BROOKS DO NOTICE OF PARTIAL COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES

Notice of Taking Deposition(s) Duces Tecum

Notice of Taking Deposition(s) Duces Tecum; Comments: Notice of Taking Deposition Duces Tecum|RE-NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF MICHAEL J CREAMER DO 03/21/2007 @ 9:00AM-1:00PM

Request for Copies

Request for Copies; Comments: Request for Copies|DEFENDANT'S REQUEST FOR COPIES

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2007
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFinal Order of Dismissal After Hearing; Comments: Final Order of Dismissal After Hearing|FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL - AFTER HEARING WITH PREJUDICE; CLERK IS ORDERED TO REMOVE THIS ACTION FROM THE DOCKET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2007
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVoluntary Dismissal; Comments: Voluntary Dismissal|NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY FOR AN DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketObjection; Comments: Objection|OBJECTIONS AND RESPONSES OF THE PURDUE DEFENDANTS TO PLAINTIFFS THIRD REQUEST TO PRODUCE DATED JANUARY 31 2007

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Cancellation of Deposition; Comments: Notice of Cancellation of Deposition|NOTICE CANC OF DEPO OF DR CREAMER 3/21 @ 9:00 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply to Affirmative Defenses; Comments: Reply to Affirmative Defenses |PLTFS REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY PURDUE DEFTS 2/07/07

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply to Affirmative Defenses; Comments: Reply to Affirmative Defenses |PLTFS REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY PURDUE DEFTS 2/08/07

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: Answer & Affirmative Defenses|DEFTS ABBOTT LABORATORIES & ABBOTT LABORATORIES INC ANSWER & DEFENSES REQUEST FOR RELIEF & JURY DEMAND

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2007
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer; Comments: Answer|DEFT PURDUE PHARMA INC ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
278 More Docket Entries
  • 08/04/2004
  • DocketInterrogatories; Comments: Interrogatories |INTERROGATORIES TO: DEFT FRANCIS W BROOKS D.O.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2004
  • DocketPetition; Comments: Petition|PETITION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2004
  • DocketInitial Judge Assigned; Comments: Initial Judge Assigned|INITIAL JUDGE ASSIGNED MACKINNON, C Z 39

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2004
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Comments: Civil Cover Sheet|CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2004
  • DocketDescription: Payment; Payer: CASSARO, PATRICK; Amount: -31.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2004
  • DocketDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 31.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2004
  • DocketDescription: Payment; Payer: CASSARO, PATRICK; Amount: -24.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2004
  • DocketDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 24.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2004
  • DocketDescription: Payment; Payer: CASSARO, PATRICK; Amount: -273.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2004
  • DocketDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 273.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PURDUE PHARMACEUTICALS L P is a litigant

Latest cases where ABBOT SALES MARKETING & DISTRIBUTION CO. A CALIFORNIA ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases where The P.F. Laboratories, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where James K Shea MD Inc is a litigant