This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 03/17/2022 at 01:40:32 (UTC).

ANICETTE, SAMMY T vs. JOSEPH, SHERAN S

Case Summary

On 01/05/2006 ANICETTE, SAMMY T filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JOSEPH, SHERAN S. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Diana M. Tennis. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************13-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2006

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Diana M. Tennis

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SAMMY T ANICETTE

Respondent

SHERAN S JOSEPH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ELIZABETH BALAGUER

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

06/21/2016

DocketDepartment of Revenue Intercept Credit

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/21/2016

DocketDepartment of Revenue Intercept Credit

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/14/2016

DocketNotice Termination of IV-D Services

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/10/2012

DocketArrearage Affidavit

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2012

DocketNotice Cancellation of Hearing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/28/2012

DocketReturned Mail

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/20/2012

DocketNotice to Depository

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2012

FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: BALAGUER, ELIZABETH, Esquire; Amount: -8.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2012

FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 8.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2012

DocketOrder for Income Deduction

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
56 More Docket Entries
01/05/2006

DocketAnswer

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2006

DocketCopy of Drivers License

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2006

DocketNotice of Social Security

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2006

DocketFinancial Affidavit

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2006

DocketNotice of Limitation of Services Provided

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2006

DocketDeclaration Under Uniform Child Custody Act

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2006

DocketProperty Settlement Agreement

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2006

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2006

DocketPetition

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/05/2006

DocketInitial Judge Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less