This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 09/06/2019 at 16:14:26 (UTC).

ALZATE, PATRICIAet al. vs. ADVENTIST HEALTH SYSTEM / SUNBELT INCet al.

Case Summary

On 05/23/2005 ALZATE, PATRICIA filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against ADVENTIST HEALTH SYSTEM / SUNBELT INC. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Luis F Calderon. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************08-O

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2005

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Luis F Calderon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ANCIZAR ALZATE OBO

PATRICIA ALZATE

ANCIZAR JR ALZATE

STEPHEN ALZATE

VANESSA ALZATE

Defendants

FLORIDA HOSPITAL/ORLANDO DBA

ADVENTIST HEALTH SYSTEM / SUNBELT INC

ABC

JOHN K LAPP

CENTRAL FLORIDA INTERNISTS INC

MUHAMMAD A KHAN

MADHUSUDANA K KALAKOTA

M KALAKOTA MD PA

Guardian Ad Litem

ANCIZAR ALZATE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Guardian Ad Litem and Plaintiff Attorney

R. COLVIN

Defendant Attorneys

JOHN TRESS

KEVIN O'HARA

J. INGRAM

AARYN FULLER

 

Court Documents

Order of Dismissal

Order of Dismissal

Letter

Letter

Letter

Letter

MEDIATION REPORT - SETTLED

MEDIATION REPORT - SETTLED

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

Amended Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Amended Notice of Taking Deposition(s); Comments: Duces Tecum of Jorge Molina

Amended Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Amended Notice of Taking Deposition(s); Comments: Duces Tecum of Jorge Molina

Motion In Limine

Motion In Limine; Comments: #6

Motion In Limine

Motion In Limine; Comments: #3

Motion In Limine

Motion In Limine; Comments: #4

Motion In Limine

Motion In Limine; Comments: #5

Motion In Limine

Motion In Limine; Comments: #7

Motion In Limine

Motion In Limine; Comments: #9

Motion In Limine

Motion In Limine; Comments: #8

Motion In Limine

Motion In Limine

Motion In Limine

Motion In Limine; Comments: #2

Motion In Limine

Motion In Limine; Comments: #10

Amended Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Amended Notice of Taking Deposition(s); Comments: Duces Tecum

163 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/09/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder of Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2012
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLetter

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEDIATION REPORT - SETTLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2011
  • DocketHEARING - Status Hearing - Kest, John Marshall (Actual: Kest, John Marshall)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Notice of Taking Deposition(s); Comments: Duces Tecum of Jorge Molina

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Notice of Taking Deposition(s); Comments: Duces Tecum of Jorge Molina

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion In Limine; Comments: #6

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion In Limine; Comments: #3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
324 More Docket Entries
  • 06/10/2005
  • DocketPetition or Motion to Strike; Comments: Petition/Motion to Strike|KHAN & CENTRAL FL 'S MOTION TO STRIKE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2005
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: Answer & Affirmative Defenses|MUHAMMAD A. KHAN M.D. & CENTRAL FLORIDA INTERNISTS ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2005
  • Docket20 Day Summons Issued; Comments: 20 Day Summons Issued|20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED; 6 TO NORMA FOR ATTY TO PICK UP FOR DEFTS 1-6 NO SUMMONS FOR DEFT 7 (ABC)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2005
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Comments: Civil Cover Sheet|CIVIL COVER SHEET FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2005
  • DocketComplaint; Comments: Complaint|COMPLAINT FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2005
  • DocketInitial Judge Assigned; Comments: Initial Judge Assigned|INITIAL JUDGE ASSIGNED BRONSON, THEOTIS 33

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2005
  • DocketDescription: Payment; Payer: ALZATE, PATRICIA; Amount: -6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2005
  • DocketDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 6.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2005
  • DocketDescription: Payment; Payer: ALZATE, PATRICIA; Amount: -259.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2005
  • DocketDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 259.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FLORIDA HOSPITAL ORLANDO DBA is a litigant

Latest cases where ADVENTIST HEALTH SYSTEM SUNBELT INC is a litigant

Latest cases where ABC CORPORATIONS 1-100 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBERT COLVIN