Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 03/21/2021 at 15:39:26 (UTC).

ZENO, RICHARD vs. COSTA, DOREEN CHRISTINA

Case Summary

On 01/20/2021 ZENO, RICHARD filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against COSTA, DOREEN CHRISTINA. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Reginald K Whitehead. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************68-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Reginald K Whitehead

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RICHARD ZENO

Defendant

DOREEN CHRISTINA COSTA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CARLOS DIEZ-ARGUELLES

Defendant Attorney

ANDREW LEEPER

 

Court Documents

Response to Request for Admissions

Response to Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address; Comments: AND REQUEST FOR DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Complaint

Complaint

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Interrogatories

Interrogatories

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address; Comments: AND REQUEST FOR DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Carlos Diez-Arguelles; Amount: -410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketInterrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Diez-Arguelles, Carlos R