This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 03/03/2019 at 15:32:11 (UTC).

YLIENIS, ANTOINE et al.vs.AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 YLIENIS, ANTOINE filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Chad K Alvaro. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************37-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Orange County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Chad K Alvaro

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ANTOINE YLIENIS

MARIE LUCIE MONDELUS

Defendant

AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EUNICE CABRERA

 

Court Documents

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed to Atty

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS DISCOVERY REQUESTS by AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Complaint

Complaint

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Interrogatories

Interrogatories

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS DISCOVERY REQUESTS by AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: AMERICAN INTEGRITY INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: Emailed to Atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Eunice Cabrera; Amount: -410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 410.00

    Read MoreRead Less