This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 01/10/2022 at 15:34:29 (UTC).

WRIGHT ENTERTAINMENT AND SPORTS PRODUCTION LLC vs. MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INCet al.

Case Summary

On 11/11/2021 WRIGHT ENTERTAINMENT AND SPORTS PRODUCTION LLC filed an Other lawsuit against MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Reginald K Whitehead. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************67-O

  • Filing Date:

    11/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Reginald K Whitehead

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WRIGHT ENTERTAINMENT AND SPORTS PRODUCTION LLC

Defendants

FIA CARD SERVICES NA

THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS INC

BANK OF AMERICA AKA

JOSE E PADILLA

Orlando, FL 32807

THE BANK OF NEW YORK AKA

COUNTRYWIDE HOME LOANS INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAHUL PARIKH

 

Court Documents

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Complaint

Complaint

Lis Pendens

Lis Pendens

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Unavailability

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: THE BANK OF NEW YORK MELLON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Non-Service; Comments: JOSE E. PADILLA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Dropping Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Dropping Parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDisclaimer; Comments: Sent Via E-Rec

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: FIA CARD SERVICES N.A. FKA BANK OF AMERICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: CONTRYWIDE HOME LOANS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: MORTGAGE ELECTRONIC REGISTRATION SYSTEMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: PARIKH, RAHUL Y; Amount: -50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketService Document Unable to be Issued; Comments: Per Admin Order No. 2021-04, a Standing Case Management Plan/Order for Streamlined or General civil cases must be submitted before summonses can be issued. Please resubmit the proposed summons along with the Case management Order Separately.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: PARIKH, RAHUL Y; Amount: -450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLis Pendens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fia Card Services, NA is a litigant

Latest cases where Countrywide Home Lons, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where The Bank of New York Mellon Trust Company, NA is a litigant

Latest cases where Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. is a litigant