This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 05/08/2023 at 15:59:56 (UTC).

WORLD AUTO GLASS LLCvs.ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY, ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/09/2023 WORLD AUTO GLASS LLCvs ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY, ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY, ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY, ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew L Cameron. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************53-O

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Andrew L Cameron

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WORLD AUTO GLASS LLC

STEVEN AND LESA VIERLING AAO

LLOYD'S GLASS CO DBA

Defendants

ALLSTATE FIRE AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY

ALLSTATE INDEMNITY COMPANY

ALLSTATE PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KRISTY BARROWS

Defendant Attorney

CHRISTOPHER MARTIN

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Correspondence

Correspondence

Complaint

Complaint

Addendum to

Addendum to

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed Atty

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Motion to Dismiss

Motion to Dismiss; Comments: AS TO IMPROPERLY NAMED DEFENDANTS

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss; Comments: AS TO IMPROPERLY NAMED DEFENDANTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed Atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Kristy L Barrows; Amount: -185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less