This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 11/21/2022 at 16:12:06 (UTC).

WISE CHIROPRACTIC, P.A. vs. PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 09/22/2022 WISE CHIROPRACTIC, P A filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Elizabeth J Starr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************19-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Elizabeth J Starr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WISE CHIROPRACTIC, P.A.

TAMMY BONNELL AAO

WISE CHIROPRACTIC DBA

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GINA KIMMEL

Defendant Attorney

NICOLE CARRERO

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: TO DEFENDANT

Notice of Compliance

Notice of Compliance; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

Addendum to

Addendum to

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: SERVED AS TO PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY

Motion

Motion; Comments: DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND INITIAL DISCOVERY SERVED WITH COMPLAINT

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND NOTICE OF E-MAIL DESIGNATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND NOTICE OF E-MAIL DESIGNATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion; Comments: DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND INITIAL DISCOVERY SERVED WITH COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: SERVED AS TO PROGRESSIVE EXPRESS INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Gina Kimmel; Amount: -185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Compliance; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESS(ES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce; Comments: TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WISE CHIROPRACTIC DBA is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive Express Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NICOLE CARRERO