Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 01/19/2019 at 15:47:16 (UTC).

WISE CHIROPRACTIC PA vs. GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/20/2018 WISE CHIROPRACTIC PA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Martha C Adams and Gisela T Laurent. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************70-O

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Martha C Adams

Gisela T Laurent

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JEREMY SCALA AAO

WISE CHIROPRACTIC PA

Defendant

GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TODD LANDAU

 

Court Documents

Notice of Change of Address

Notice of Change of Address

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: REGARDING SPORTS-RELATED INJURY

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: REGARDING RELATEDNESS AND MEDICAL NECESSITY

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: REGARDING WORKER S COMPENSATION

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: REGARDING SPORTS-RELATED INJURY

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: email to atty

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Complaint

Complaint

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: REGARDING RELATEDNESS AND MEDICAL NECESSITY

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT REGARDING UNDERWRITING AND POLICY FORMS

Request to Produce

Request to Produce; Comments: REGARDING UNDERWRITING

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions; Comments: REGARDING FEE SCHEDULE

Motion for Summary Judgment

Motion for Summary Judgment; Comments: AS TO THE APPLICATION OF SO-CALLED STATUTORY FEE SCHEDULES AT FLA. STAT. 627.736(5)(a)(2)

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Change of Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: REGARDING SPORTS-RELATED INJURY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce; Comments: REGARDING RELATEDNESS AND MEDICAL NECESSITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: REGARDING WORKER S COMPENSATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: REGARDING SPORTS-RELATED INJURY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: REGARDING RELATEDNESS AND MEDICAL NECESSITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: TO DEFENDANT REGARDING UNDERWRITING AND POLICY FORMS

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY PIONNE CORBIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: email to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Landau & Associates, P.A.; Amount: -90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 90.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WISE CHIROPRACTIC PA is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO INDEMNITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Landau, Todd A