This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 01/05/2022 at 15:33:07 (UTC).

WINDSHIELDS DIRECT LLCvs.SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY, FOREMOST PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 11/06/2021 WINDSHIELDS DIRECT LLCvs SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY, FOREMOST PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Eric H DuBois and Michael Deen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************12-O

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Eric H DuBois

Michael Deen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WINDSHIELDS DIRECT LLC

CLAUSEL DESIR AAO

Defendants

SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

FOREMOST INSURANCE COMPANY

FOREMOST PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRUCE KAUFFMAN

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Addendum to

Addendum to

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim; Comments: SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, ET AL

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request

Request; Comments: FOR DEPOSITIONS

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: Electronic Delivery 11/15/21 Security National Insurance Company

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: Electronic Delivery 11/15/21 Security National Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest; Comments: FOR DEPOSITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Bruce H Kauffman; Amount: -185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim; Comments: SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY, ET AL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WINDSHIELD DIRECT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where FOREMOST PROPERTY AND CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where Security National Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Foremost Insurance Company is a litigant