This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 11/07/2021 at 17:03:40 (UTC).

WINDSHIELDS DIRECT LLCvs.MENDOTA INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/14/2021 WINDSHIELDS DIRECT LLCvs MENDOTA INSURANCE COMPANY was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael Deen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************06-O

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Michael Deen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WINDSHIELDS DIRECT LLC

FELIX JOSETTE AAO

Defendant

MENDOTA INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRUCE KAUFFMAN

Defendant Attorney

GEOFFREY SANDERS

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim; Comments: MENDOTA INSURANCE COMPANY

Addendum to

Addendum to

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

Request

Request; Comments: PLAINTIFF S REQUEST FOR DEPOSITIONS

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: MENDOTA INS COMP

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Motion for Protective Order

Motion for Protective Order; Comments: AND RENEWED MOTION TO STAY ANY AND ALL DISCOVERY SERVED

Motion to Stay

Motion to Stay; Comments: AND COMPEL APPRAISAL

Objection

Objection; Comments: TO PLAINTIFF S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

Objection

Objection; Comments: TO PLAINTIFF S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

Objection

Objection; Comments: TO PLAINTIFF S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL APPRAISAL

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Comments: SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL APPRAISAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketObjection; Comments: TO PLAINTIFF S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketObjection; Comments: TO PLAINTIFF S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketObjection; Comments: TO PLAINTIFF S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Stay; Comments: AND COMPEL APPRAISAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Protective Order; Comments: AND RENEWED MOTION TO STAY ANY AND ALL DISCOVERY SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: MENDOTA INS COMP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest; Comments: PLAINTIFF S REQUEST FOR DEPOSITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Sean Amorginos; Amount: -185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EM ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim; Comments: MENDOTA INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WINDSHIELD DIRECT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where MENDOTA INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GEOFFREY SANDERS