This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 12/14/2021 at 16:00:48 (UTC).

WINDSHIELDS DIRECT LLCvs.MENDOTA INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 10/15/2021 WINDSHIELDS DIRECT LLCvs MENDOTA INSURANCE COMPANY was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Elizabeth J Starr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************09-O

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Elizabeth J Starr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WINDSHIELDS DIRECT LLC AAO TIMOTHY GLATTI

WINDSHIELDS DIRECT LLC

TIMOTHY GILATTI AAO

Defendant

MENDOTA INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRUCE KAUFFMAN

Defendant Attorney

GEOFFREY SANDERS

 

Court Documents

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Objection

Objection; Comments: TO PLAINTIFF S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

Objection

Objection; Comments: TO PLAINTIFF S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE

Motion to Stay

Motion to Stay; Comments: AND COMPEL APPRAISAL

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Motion for Protective Order

Motion for Protective Order; Comments: AND RENEWED MOTION TO STAY ANY AND ALL DISCOVERY SERVED

Objection

Objection; Comments: TO PLAINTIFF S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing; Comments: SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL APPRAISAL

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: MENDOTA INS COMP

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request

Request; Comments: PLAINTIFF S REQUEST FOR DEPOSITIONS

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTORNEY

Addendum to

Addendum to

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply to Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketObjection; Comments: TO PLAINTIFF S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketObjection; Comments: TO PLAINTIFF S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Stay; Comments: AND COMPEL APPRAISAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Protective Order; Comments: AND RENEWED MOTION TO STAY ANY AND ALL DISCOVERY SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketObjection; Comments: TO PLAINTIFF S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Filing; Comments: SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL APPRAISAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: MENDOTA INS COMP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest; Comments: PLAINTIFF S REQUEST FOR DEPOSITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Sean Amorginos; Amount: -185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddendum to

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WINDSHIELD DIRECT LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where MENDOTA INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GEOFFREY SANDERS