This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 08/15/2022 at 16:16:01 (UTC).

WILSON SILVA GUIMARAESvs.WALT DISNEY PARKS AND RESORTS US INC

Case Summary

On 06/16/2022 WILSON SILVA GUIMARAESvs WALT DISNEY PARKS AND RESORTS US INC was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew L Cameron. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************72-O

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Andrew L Cameron

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WILSON SILVA GUIMARAES

Defendant

WALT DISNEY PARKS AND RESORTS US INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZEFFERY MIMS

Defendant Attorney

PATRICK MIXSON

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Exhibit(s)

Exhibit(s)

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: emailed to attorney

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Demand for Jury Trial

Demand for Jury Trial

Motion to Invoke Florida Rules of Civil Procedure

Motion to Invoke Florida Rules of Civil Procedure

Motion to Dismiss

Motion to Dismiss; Comments: PLAINTIFFS STATEMENT OF CLAIM AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

Order Following Pre-Trial Conference

Order Following Pre-Trial Conference

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2022
  • HearingHearing: Pre-Trial Civil - Pulayya, Juna (Actual: Pulayya, Juna); Location: Video/Audio/Tele Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder Following Pre-Trial Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • DocketHEARING - Pre-Trial Civil - Pulayya, Juna (Actual: Pulayya, Juna)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss; Comments: PLAINTIFFS STATEMENT OF CLAIM AND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Invoke Florida Rules of Civil Procedure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: emailed to attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Zeffery Mims; Amount: -310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibit(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALT DISNEY PARKS AND RESORTS US INC DBA MAGIC is a litigant