This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 05/13/2022 at 15:38:00 (UTC).

WILFORD, DANDRE vs. RODRIGUEZ PLAZA, EDDIE Jet al.

Case Summary

On 03/14/2022 WILFORD, DANDRE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against RODRIGUEZ PLAZA, EDDIE J. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Denise Kim Beamer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************30-O

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Denise Kim Beamer

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DANDRE WILFORD

Defendants

SNOWBALL PIZZA INC

EDDIE J RODRIGUEZ PLAZA

DOMINOS PIZZA DBA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARIADELMAR CALERO

 

Court Documents

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Return of Service of Summons

Return of Service of Summons; Comments: SERVED 4/20/2022 SNOWBALL PIZZA INC DBA DOMINOS PIZZA DANIEL GROSSMAN

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Complaint

Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturn of Service of Summons; Comments: SERVED 4/20/2022 SNOWBALL PIZZA INC DBA DOMINOS PIZZA DANIEL GROSSMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Mariadelmar Calero; Amount: -420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DOMINOS PIZZA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MARIADELMAR CALERO