This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 03/04/2023 at 07:23:13 (UTC).

WHITE, BRANDONvs.SIDDHI HOSPITAL ORLANDO LLC

Case Summary

On 07/11/2022 WHITE, BRANDONvs SIDDHI HOSPITAL ORLANDO LLC was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************40-O

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRANDON WHITE

Defendants

SIDDHI HOSPITAL ORLANDO LLC

QUALITY INN DBA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ADARYLL LEE

Defendant Attorney

MICHELE MORALES

 

Court Documents

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: GENERAL PERSONAL INJURY

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: Defendant, SIDDHI HOSPITALITY ORLANDO, LLC

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Default Entered by the Clerk

Default Entered by the Clerk; Comments: EM ATTY

Motion for Default

Motion for Default; Comments: SIDDHI HOSPITALITY ORLANDO, LLC DBA QUALITY INN

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: SERVED 7-21-2022 SIDDHI HOSPITALITY ORLANDO LLC DBA QUALITY INN

Complaint

Complaint

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Complaint

Complaint

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketResponse to Request to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: GENERAL PERSONAL INJURY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: Defendant, SIDDHI HOSPITALITY ORLANDO, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 07/14/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketService Document Unable to be Issued; Comments: Per Admin Order No. 2021-04, a Standing Case Management Plan/Order for Streamlined or General civil cases must be submitted at time of filing. Please correct and resubmit the entire filing within 5 business days.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Gee and Lee Attorneys at Law; Amount: -410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less