This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 02/17/2022 at 09:17:46 (UTC).

WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES LLCvs.LARRY MAYBERRY

Case Summary

On 02/24/2021 WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES LLCvs LARRY MAYBERRY was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian Sandor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************46-O

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Brian Sandor

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC

WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES DBA

Defendant

LARRY MAYBERRY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVID KAMINSKI

 

Court Documents

Notice of Transfer

Notice of Transfer

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service

Copy or Copies

Copy or Copies; Comments: Civil Case Progress Docket

Complaint

Complaint

Notice of Confidential Information within Court Filing

Notice of Confidential Information within Court Filing

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Summons Returned Unserved

Summons Returned Unserved

Motion to Transfer

Motion to Transfer; Comments: Plaintiff's

Order to Transfer

Order to Transfer

Summons Issued

Summons Issued; Comments: Personal Service To Larry Mayberry

Alias Summons Issued

Alias Summons Issued; Comments: Personal Service To Larry Mayberry

Notice

Notice; Comments: Of Lack Of Prosecution

Correspondence

Correspondence

Returned Mail

Returned Mail

Correspondence

Correspondence; Comments: from Seminole County Clerk Office

Notice Lack of Prosecution/Motion to Dism/Notice Hearing

Notice Lack of Prosecution/Motion to Dism/Notice Hearing; Comments: 3/30/22 @ 9:00 Am

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Lack of Prosecution/Motion to Dism/Notice Hearing; Comments: 3/30/22 @ 9:00 Am

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReturned Mail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: WESTLAKE FINANCIAL SERVICES LLC; Amount: -300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 300.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Transfer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence; Comments: from Seminole County Clerk Office

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice; Comments: Of Lack Of Prosecution

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAlias Summons Issued; Comments: Personal Service To Larry Mayberry

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued; Comments: Personal Service To Larry Mayberry

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Transfer; Comments: Plaintiff's

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Unserved

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information within Court Filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCopy or Copies; Comments: Civil Case Progress Docket

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less