This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 06/12/2022 at 15:35:45 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO USA HOLDINGS INCvs.BROWN, BRANDON JAMES et al.

Case Summary

On 04/13/2022 WELLS FARGO USA HOLDINGS INCvs BROWN, BRANDON JAMES was filed as a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Kevin B. Weiss. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************35-O

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Kevin B. Weiss

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO USA HOLDINGS INC

Defendants

BRANDON JAMES BROWN

CAMERON G BROWN

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BRANDON JAMES BROWN

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

THE UNKNOWN BENEFICIARIES OF THE LUCY F HARRIS TRUST DATED

HIDDEN SPRINGS ESTATES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

THE LUCY F HARRIS TRUST DATED SUCTRST

THE LUCY F HARRIS TRUST DATED BEN

WELLS FARGO FINANCIAL BANK SI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANNA ROSENBERG

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint

Affidavit of Non-Service

Affidavit of Non-Service; Comments: UNKNOWN TENANT2

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: SERVED 5/3/2022 THE UNKNOWN BENEFICIARIES OF THE LUCY F HARRIS TRUST DATED JANUARY 11 2019

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: SERVED 4/27/2022 WELLS FARGO BANK NA SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO WELLS FARGO FINANCIAL BANK

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: SERVED 5/3/2022 CAMERON G BROWN AS A KNOWN BENEFICIARY OF THE LUCY F HARRIS TRUST DATED JANUARY 11 2019

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: SERVED 4/28/2022 HIDDEN SPRINGS ESTATES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: SERVED 5/3/2022 CAMERON G BROWN AS SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THELUCY F HARRIS TRUST DATED JANUARY 11 2019

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: SERVED 5/5/2022 BRANDON JAMES BROWN

Affidavit of Non-Service

Affidavit of Non-Service; Comments: UNKNOWN TENANT 1

Affidavit of Non-Service

Affidavit of Non-Service; Comments: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BRANDON JAMES BROWN

Reply

Reply

Motion

Motion

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: emailed atty

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Non-Service; Comments: UNKNOWN TENANT2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: SERVED 5/3/2022 THE UNKNOWN BENEFICIARIES OF THE LUCY F HARRIS TRUST DATED JANUARY 11 2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: SERVED 4/27/2022 WELLS FARGO BANK NA SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO WELLS FARGO FINANCIAL BANK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: SERVED 5/3/2022 CAMERON G BROWN AS A KNOWN BENEFICIARY OF THE LUCY F HARRIS TRUST DATED JANUARY 11 2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: SERVED 4/28/2022 HIDDEN SPRINGS ESTATES HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: SERVED 5/3/2022 CAMERON G BROWN AS SUCCESSOR TRUSTEE OF THELUCY F HARRIS TRUST DATED JANUARY 11 2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Service; Comments: SERVED 5/5/2022 BRANDON JAMES BROWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Non-Service; Comments: UNKNOWN TENANT 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAffidavit of Non-Service; Comments: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BRANDON JAMES BROWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 1005.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate; Comments: Of Possession of Original Promissory Note

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertification Settlement Authority

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketForm "A"

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketValue of Real Property/Mortgage Foreclosure Claim Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLis Pendens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WELLS FARGO FINANCIAL NATIONAL BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where WELLS FARGO USA HOLDINGS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROSENBERG, ANNA JUDD