This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 12/17/2021 at 17:18:40 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK NAvs.FRANCISCO V MO

Case Summary

On 11/23/2021 WELLS FARGO BANK NAvs FRANCISCO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MO. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian F Duckworth. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************01-O

  • Filing Date:

    11/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Brian F Duckworth

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

Defendant

FRANCISCO V MO

Winter Garden, FL 34787-4943

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AMIR NADERPOUR

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Motion to Appoint for Service of Process

Motion to Appoint for Service of Process

Notice of Confidential Information within Court Filing

Notice of Confidential Information within Court Filing; Comments: COMPLAINT

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

Statement of Claim

Statement of Claim

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: Served 12/4/21 5:09 pm FRANCISCO V MO

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2022
  • HearingHearing: Pre-Trial Civil - Civil, Pretrial; Location: Video/Audio/Tele Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketHEARING - Pre-Trial Civil - Civil, Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; Comments: Served 12/4/21 5:09 pm FRANCISCO V MO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Amir Naderpour; Amount: -310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Confidential Information within Court Filing; Comments: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Appoint for Service of Process

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStatement of Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer AMIR NADERPOUR