This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 02/28/2019 at 20:46:38 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK NA vs.CALVARY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC et al.

Case Summary

On 05/15/2015 WELLS FARGO BANK NA filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CALVARY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are KEST, JOHN MARSHALL, John Marshall Kest and Chad K Alvaro. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************81-O

  • Filing Date:

    05/15/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

KEST, JOHN MARSHALL

John Marshall Kest

Chad K Alvaro

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WELLS FARGO BANK NA

WELLS FARGO BANK NA Trustee LAKE COUNTRY MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2005-HE1

LAKE COUNTRY MORTGAGE LOAN TRUST 2005-HE1 TRST

Defendants

CALVARY PORTFOLIO SERVICES LLC

HIDDEN CREEK CONDOMINIUM ASSOCIATION INC

HOMESIDE LENDING INC

MEDINA, CARLOS M

MEDINA, EILEEN Also known as EILEEN ROSADO

THE UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CARLOS M MEDINA

THE UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF EILEEN MEDINA

UM ACQUISITIONS LLC

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION OF

MEDINA, EILEEN Formerly known as EILEEN ROSADO

THE UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF EILEEN MEDINA Formerly known as ROSADO, EILEEN

CARLOS M MEDINA

EILEEN MEDINA

EILEEN ROSADO FKA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TIMOTHY DANIEL PADGETT, Esquire

TIMOTHY PADGETT

Defendant Attorneys

CANDACE SOLIS

SCOTT PODVIN

 

Court Documents

Notice of Unavailability

Notice of Unavailability

Order for Default

Order for Default

Motion for Default to Court

Motion for Default to Court

Order Enlargement/Extension of Time

Order Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: to respond to complaint is GRANTED - 20 DAYS

Default Entered by the Clerk

Default Entered by the Clerk

Motion for Default

Motion for Default; Comments: (Cavalry Portfolio Services LLC, Homeside Lending Inc and UM Acquisitions LLC)

Notice

Notice; Comments: ATTENDANCE ROLL FOR MEDIATION SESSION

Certification Settlement Authority

Certification Settlement Authority

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: CARLOS M MEDINA

Summons Returned Unserved

Summons Returned Unserved; Comments: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF EILEEN MEDINA

Order Appointing Process Server

Order Appointing Process Server

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: E-Mail Attorney

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: E-Mail Attorney

Exhibit(s)

Exhibit(s); Comments: "2"

Lis Pendens

Lis Pendens

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

65 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Voluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Voluntary Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: and Designation of Electronic Service Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion to Withdraw; Comments: AS COUNSEL (Eileen Medina)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Unavailability

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Order for Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter; Comments: to Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Dropping Party

    Read MoreRead Less
66 More Docket Entries
  • 05/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Value of Real Property/Mortgage Foreclosure Claim Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Lis Pendens

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • Description: Payment; Payer: PADGETT, TIMOTHY DANIEL; Amount: -10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Timothy D Padgett; Amount: -500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BancBoston Mortgage Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where CALVARY PORTFOLIO SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PODVIN, SCOTT LOWELL