This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 11/14/2022 at 15:44:31 (UTC).

WELLS FARGO BANK N A vs. WALTER FALLIN, JERRYet al.

Case Summary

On 09/15/2022 WELLS FARGO BANK N A filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against WALTER FALLIN, JERRY. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey L Ashton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************65-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Jeffrey L Ashton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

WELLS FARGO BANK N A

Defendants

JERRY WALTER FALLIN

MARILYN M FALLIN

UNKNOWNN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

SUNTRUST BANK

TANGLEWOOD ON KALEY NEIGHBORHOOD ASSOCIATION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ANNA ROSENBERG

Defendant Attorneys

ARTHUR BARKSDALE

LACI CASADO

 

Court Documents

Complaint

Complaint

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Answer

Answer; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR EXCESS SALE PROCESS - TRUIST BANK

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: TANGLEWOOD ON KALEY NEIGHBORHOOD ASSOCIATION, INC

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Streamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Form "A"

Form "A"

Value of Real Property/Mortgage Foreclosure Claim Form

Value of Real Property/Mortgage Foreclosure Claim Form

Lis Pendens

Lis Pendens

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketReply to Affirmative Defenses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer; Comments: AND DEMAND FOR EXCESS SALE PROCESS - TRUIST BANK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: TANGLEWOOD ON KALEY NEIGHBORHOOD ASSOCIATION, INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Anna J. Rosenberg; Amount: -967.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 967.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketStreamlined Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketForm "A"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketValue of Real Property/Mortgage Foreclosure Claim Form

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLis Pendens

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/15/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUNTRUST BANKS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LACI CASADO

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARKSDALE, ARTHUR SYDNOR IV