This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 03/03/2019 at 15:33:02 (UTC).

FERREIRA, ELIZABETH vs. CYPRUS AMAX MINERALS COet al.

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 FERREIRA, ELIZABETH filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against CYPRUS AMAX MINERALS CO. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Chad K Alvaro. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************55-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    Orange County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Chad K Alvaro

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MINOR CHILD AKA

MATTHEW P WEATHERMAN

TONY WEATHERMAN

ELIZABETH FERREIRA

MINOR CHILD

Defendants

CYPRUS AMAX MINERALS CO

JOHNSON AND JOHNSON CONSUMER INC

ALLIED SIGNAL AKA

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC

PUBLIX SUPER MARKETS INC

LUZENAC AMERICA INC LUZENAC INC AKA

PNEUMO ABEX CORPORATION AKA

GENUINE PARTS COMPANY

JOHNSON AND JOHNSON

SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO CHARLES MATHIEU AKA

IMERYS TALC AMERICA INC

PNEUMO ABEX LLC

ALLIED SIGNAL FKA

LUZENAC AMERICA INC LUZENAC INC FKA

SUCCESSOR IN INTEREST TO CHARLES MATHIEU

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JOSE LUIS BECERRA

Defendant Attorney

ANDREA COX

 

Court Documents

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: and notice of designation of email addresses

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: and notice of desigantion of email addresses

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: GENUINE PARTS COMPANY

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: CYPRUS AMAX MINERALS CO

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: JOHNSON & JOHNSON

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: served Honeywell International, Inc

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: served Publix Super Markets, Inc

Suggestion - Notice of Bankruptcy and Auto Stay

Suggestion - Notice of Bankruptcy and Auto Stay; Comments: bk# 19-10289

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: served Imerys Talc America, Inc

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: served Pneumo Abex LLC

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: E Mail Attorney

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: E Mail Attorney

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: E Mail Attorney

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: E Mail Attorney

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: E Mail Attorney

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: E Mail Attorney

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: and notice of designation of email addresses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: and notice of desigantion of email addresses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Returned Served; Comments: GENUINE PARTS COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Returned Served; Comments: CYPRUS AMAX MINERALS CO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Returned Served; Comments: JOHNSON & JOHNSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Service; Comments: served Honeywell International, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Service; Comments: served Publix Super Markets, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Suggestion - Notice of Bankruptcy and Auto Stay; Comments: bk# 19-10289

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Service; Comments: served Imerys Talc America, Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: E Mail Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Taking Deposition(s); Comments: amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Description: Payment; Payer: BECERRA, JOSE LUIS; Amount: -80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Jose L Becerra; Amount: -407.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 407.50

    Read MoreRead Less