This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 01/15/2023 at 04:24:34 (UTC).

WALTS, PAMELAvs.ENCORE GROUP USA LLC et al.

Case Summary

On 03/23/2022 WALTS, PAMELAvs ENCORE GROUP USA LLC was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************34-O

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PAMELA WALTS

Defendants

WALT DISNEY WORLD DOLPHIN RESORT DBA

ENCORE GROUP USA LLC

SHERATON OPERATING CORPORATION

TISHMAN DOLPHIN LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

WATT DISNEY WORLD DOLPHIN RESORT DBA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GEORGE KEZEMIDES

Defendant Attorneys

ANGELA DE CESPEDES

BURKE LOPEZ

 

Court Documents

Letter

Letter

Exhibit(s)

Exhibit(s)

Motion to Compel Discovery

Motion to Compel Discovery

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Compliance

Notice of Compliance; Comments: WITH DEFENDANT, ENCORE GROUP (USA), LLCS NOTICE TO PRODUCE COPIES OF DOCUMENTS OBTAINED PURSUANT TO FLA. R. CIV. P., 1.351(C)

Notice of Production of Non-Party

Notice of Production of Non-Party

Notice to Produce

Notice to Produce

Request for Copies

Request for Copies; Comments: AND NOTICE OF NON-OBJECTION

Request for Copies

Request for Copies

Notice of Intent

Notice of Intent; Comments: TO SERVE SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM WITHOUT DEPOSITION TO NON-PARTY Star Dance Alliance, LLC

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

Request for Copies

Request for Copies

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories; Comments: (Defendant, SHERATON OPERATING CORPORATION)

Notice of Service

Notice of Service; Comments: (DEFENDANT S SHERATON OPERATING CORPORATION) OF FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO PLAINTIFF, PAMELA WALTS

Notice of Intent

Notice of Intent; Comments: TO SERVE SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM WITHOUT DEPOSITION TO NON-PARTY

Response to Request to Produce

Response to Request to Produce

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/13/2022
View Court Documents

DocketLetter

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/23/2022
View Court Documents

DocketExhibit(s)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/23/2022
View Court Documents

DocketMotion to Compel Discovery

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Service of Answers to Interrogatories

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Compliance; Comments: WITH DEFENDANT, ENCORE GROUP (USA), LLCS NOTICE TO PRODUCE COPIES OF DOCUMENTS OBTAINED PURSUANT TO FLA. R. CIV. P., 1.351(C)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Production of Non-Party

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNotice to Produce

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2022
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Copies; Comments: AND NOTICE OF NON-OBJECTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/05/2022
View Court Documents

DocketRequest for Copies

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/04/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Intent; Comments: TO SERVE SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM WITHOUT DEPOSITION TO NON-PARTY Star Dance Alliance, LLC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
26 More Docket Entries
03/23/2022

FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 430.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2022
View Court Documents

DocketRequest to Produce

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2022
View Court Documents

DocketRequest to Produce

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2022
View Court Documents

DocketRequest to Produce

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2022
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2022

DocketCase Initiated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less