This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 01/26/2019 at 03:49:38 (UTC).

WALKER, SHANTE vs. WALKER, JASON E

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 WALKER, SHANTE filed a Family - Domestic Partnership Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against WALKER, JASON E. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Jeffrey L Ashton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************32-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Domestic Partnership Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Jeffrey L Ashton

 

Party Details

Petitioner

SHANTE WALKER

Respondent

JASON E WALKER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

ASHLEY MCKINNIS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2019
  • Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Motion for Enforcement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Notice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2019
  • Affidavit of Service Returned Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Affidavit of Service Returned Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Affidavit of Service Returned Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Comprehensive Case History

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Comprehensive Case History

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Final Order Permanent Injunction Recorded

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • Final Order of Injunction

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/15/2019
  • HEARING - Injunctions - Bronson, Theotis (Actual: Bronson, Theotis)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Notice Appearance of Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Affidavit of Service Returned Served

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Temporary Order/Final Hearing Injunction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Notice of Social Security

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Notice of Related Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less