This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 01/16/2023 at 22:27:30 (UTC).

WALKER, DEBORAHvs.TKR PETROLEUM LLC

Case Summary

On 04/26/2022 WALKER, DEBORAHvs TKR PETROLEUM LLC was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Vincent S. Chiu. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************76-O

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Vincent S. Chiu

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEBORAH WALKER

Defendant

TKR PETROLEUM LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILEY RARIDEN

Defendant Attorney

ERNEST MYERS

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Complaint

Complaint

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY

Amended Complaint

Amended Complaint

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAmended Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: DAVIS, BRIAN MICHAEL; Amount: -10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Brian M Davis; Amount: -400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less