This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 07/01/2018 at 13:48:15 (UTC).

VR PARK 9 HOLDINGS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP vs. VERNESSIA SMITH, WAYNE JOSEPH SMITH

Case Summary

On 04/19/2017 VR PARK 9 HOLDINGS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against VERNESSIA SMITH, WAYNE JOSEPH SMITH. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is David P Johnson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************25-O

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

David P Johnson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

VR PARK 9 HOLDINGS LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

PARK 9 APARTMENTS DBA

Defendants

WAYNE JOSEPH SMITH

VERNESSIA SMITH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBERLY PRITCHARD

 

Court Documents

Writ of Possession Returned Posted

Writ of Possession Returned Posted

Writ of Possession Issued

Writ of Possession Issued; Comments: email to atty

Final Judgment

Final Judgment

Order for Default

Order for Default

Letter

Letter; Comments: sent to judge

Order Scheduling Mediation

Order Scheduling Mediation; Comments: 05/25/17 @ 9:15 am

Scheduling Form

Scheduling Form

Motion for Final Judgment

Motion for Final Judgment

Affidavit of Non Military Service

Affidavit of Non Military Service; Comments: VERNESSIA SMITH

Affidavit of Non Military Service

Affidavit of Non Military Service; Comments: WAYNE JOSEPH SMITH

Answer

Answer; Comments: sent to judge

Certificate of Mailing

Certificate of Mailing; Comments: copy to defts (2) SASE

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: Upon Wayne Joseph Smith

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: Upon Vernessia Smith

Summons Issued 5 Day

Summons Issued 5 Day; Comments: emailed to atty

Summons Issued 5 Day

Summons Issued 5 Day; Comments: emailed to atty

Complaint

Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession Returned Posted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Writ of Possession Issued; Comments: email to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order for Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Letter; Comments: sent to judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Order Scheduling Mediation; Comments: 05/25/17 @ 9:15 am

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Scheduling Form

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Motion for Final Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Affidavit of Non Military Service; Comments: VERNESSIA SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 04/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Certificate of Mailing; Comments: copy to defts (2) SASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Returned Served; Comments: Upon Wayne Joseph Smith

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Returned Served; Comments: Upon Vernessia Smith

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued 5 Day; Comments: emailed to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Summons Issued 5 Day; Comments: emailed to atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Civil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • Description: Payment; Payer: Kimberly Leigh Pritchard; Amount: -205.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 205.00

    Read MoreRead Less