This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 10/18/2020 at 03:50:52 (UTC).

VIVAS DIAZ, JOSENA MARISOL vs. TOUMA FUENTES, NAUM ELIAS

Case Summary

On 09/24/2020 VIVAS DIAZ, JOSENA MARISOL filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against TOUMA FUENTES, NAUM ELIAS. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Vincent S. Chiu. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************67-O

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Circuit Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Circuit Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Vincent S. Chiu

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JOSENA MARISOL VIVAS DIAZ

Respondent

NAUM ELIAS TOUMA FUENTES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2020
  • DocketSummons Returned Unserved

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketCopy of Drivers License

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketCopy of Drivers License

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • DocketAffidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCorrespondence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Josena Marisol Vivas Diaz; Amount: -418.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 418.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketAffidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketFinancial Affidavit

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Social Security

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketAffidavit of Non Military Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Related Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketPetition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCover Sheet for Family Court Cases

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCertificate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketAmended Administrative Temporary Order Provided to Customer

    Read MoreRead Less