This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 02/10/2021 at 18:54:51 (UTC).

VISTA LAKES COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INCvs.COLETTE PURCELL, KEVIN PURCELL

Case Summary

On 02/11/2020 VISTA LAKES COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INCvs COLETTE PURCELL, KEVIN PURCELL was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Evellen H Jewett and Amy J Carter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************02-O

  • Filing Date:

    02/11/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Evellen H Jewett

Amy J Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VISTA LAKES COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION INC

Defendants

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

KEVIN PURCELL

COLETTE PURCELL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CANDACE SOLIS

 

Court Documents

Order Approving Settlement

Order Approving Settlement

MEDIATION REPORT - SETTLED

MEDIATION REPORT - SETTLED

MEDIATION REPORT - SETTLED

MEDIATION REPORT - SETTLED

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Notice of Mediation

Notice of Mediation; Comments: AMENDED**05/28/2020@9:30AM via TELECONFERENCE ZOOM

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: Colette Purcell and Kevin Purcell. Sent to Judge.

Entry of Default as to 20 Day

Entry of Default as to 20 Day; Comments: Emailed to atty

Notice of Dropping Parties

Notice of Dropping Parties

Affidavit of Non Military Service

Affidavit of Non Military Service; Comments: KEVIN NULL PURCELL; COLETTE PURCELL

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: Unknown Tenant #1

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: Kevin Purcell

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: Colette Purcell

Affidavit of Service

Affidavit of Service; Comments: Unknown Tenant #2

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY.

Form "A"

Form "A"

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Complaint

Complaint

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

06/15/2020
View Court Documents

DocketOrder Approving Settlement and/or Stipulation

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/15/2020
View Court Documents

DocketOrder Approving Settlement

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/12/2020
View Court Documents

DocketMEDIATION REPORT - SETTLED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/12/2020
View Court Documents

DocketMEDIATION REPORT - SETTLED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/10/2020
View Court Documents

DocketStipulation; Comments: for Settlement

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/26/2020
View Court Documents

DocketReply to Affirmative Defenses

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/15/2020
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Mediation; Comments: AMENDED**05/28/2020@9:30AM via TELECONFERENCE ZOOM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/11/2020
View Court Documents

DocketAnswer & Affirmative Defenses; Comments: Colette Purcell and Kevin Purcell. Sent to Judge.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/20/2020
View Court Documents

DocketEntry of Default as to 20 Day; Comments: Emailed to atty

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/16/2020
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Dropping Party

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
02/14/2020
View Court Documents

DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: EMAILED TO ATTY.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/11/2020

FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: BECKER and POLIAKOFF; Amount: -340.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/11/2020

FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 340.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/11/2020
View Court Documents

DocketLis Pendens

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/11/2020
View Court Documents

DocketForm "A"

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/11/2020
View Court Documents

DocketNotice of Designation of Email Address

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/11/2020
View Court Documents

DocketComplaint

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/11/2020
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/11/2020
View Court Documents

DocketCivil Cover Sheet

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/11/2020

DocketCase Initiated

[+] Read More [-] Read Less