This case was last updated from Orange County Florida Courts on 07/24/2022 at 15:54:33 (UTC).

VISION AUTO GLASS OF FLORIDA INC vs.USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/25/2022 VISION AUTO GLASS OF FLORIDA INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Florida Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Andrew Bain. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************32-O

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Andrew Bain

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

VISION AUTO GLASS OF FLORIDA INC

MARK MORRIS AAO

Defendant

USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEE JACOBSON

Defendant Attorney

LEE TOBIN

 

Court Documents

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet

Civil Cover Sheet; Comments: ADDENDUM

Complaint

Complaint

Exhibit(s)

Exhibit(s)

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

General Standing Case Management Plan/Order

Summons Issued Electronically as to

Summons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: em atty

Motion to Dismiss

Motion to Dismiss; Comments: COMPLAINT/STATEMENT OF CLAIM, MOTION TO STRIKE ALLEGATIONS OF COMPLAINT/STATEMENT OF CLAIM, AND MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT

Motion to Stay

Motion to Stay; Comments: PENDING RULING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS, STRIKE AND FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time

Motion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Process/Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion for Enlargement/Extension of Time; Comments: TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Stay; Comments: PENDING RULING ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS, STRIKE AND FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss; Comments: COMPLAINT/STATEMENT OF CLAIM, MOTION TO STRIKE ALLEGATIONS OF COMPLAINT/STATEMENT OF CLAIM, AND MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: em atty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Lee M. Jacobson; Amount: -185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Standing Case Management Plan/Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExhibit(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet; Comments: ADDENDUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VISION AUTO GLASS OF FLORIDA INC is a litigant

Latest cases where USAA Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEE TOBIN