Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 02/01/2019 at 15:53:25 (UTC).

VISION AUTO GLASS OF FLORIDA INC vs. GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/03/2018 VISION AUTO GLASS OF FLORIDA INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Orange County Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Martha C Adams and Gisela T Laurent. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************29-O

  • Filing Date:

    12/03/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Orange County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Martha C Adams

Gisela T Laurent

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

VISION AUTO GLASS OF FLORIDA INC AAO BRANDAN BU

VISION AUTO GLASS OF FLORIDA INC

BRANDAN BUCHWITZ AAO

Defendant

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEE JACOBSON

Defendant Attorney

JONATHON STEPHENS

 

Court Documents

Notice Appearance of Counsel

Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: DISCLOSURE AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Answer & Affirmative Defenses

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Notice of Designation of Email Address

Stipulation Invoking the Rules of Civil Procedure

Stipulation Invoking the Rules of Civil Procedure

Notice of Service of Process/Return

Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY PIONNE CORBIN

Notice to Appear Scheduled

Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

Exhibit(s)

Exhibit(s)

Complaint

Complaint

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Request for Admissions

Request for Admissions

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice Appearance of Counsel; Comments: DISCLOSURE AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Answer & Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Designation of Email Address

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Stipulation Invoking the Rules of Civil Procedure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • HEARING - CANCELED-Stipulation Pre-Trial Civil - Civil, Pretrial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Process/Return; Comments: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY PIONNE CORBIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice to Appear Scheduled; Comments: EMAILED ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Notice of Service of Interrogatories

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request to Produce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Request for Admissions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Exhibit(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Case Initiated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Description: Payment; Payer: JACOBSON, LEE MICHAEL; Amount: -185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • Description: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VISION AUTO GLASS OF FLORIDA INC is a litigant

Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JACOBSON, LEE M