This case was last updated from Orange County Circuit Courts on 01/12/2023 at 15:01:39 (UTC).

VINEYARDS OF HORIZONS WEST TOWNHOME ASSOCIATION INC vs. KB HOME ORLANDO LLC et al.

Case Summary

On 01/26/2022 VINEYARDS OF HORIZONS WEST TOWNHOME ASSOCIATION INC filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against KB HOME ORLANDO LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Circuit Courts, Orange County Circuit Courthouse located in Orange, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is John E Jordan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************84-O

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Orange, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

John E Jordan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

VINEYARDS OF HORIZONS WEST TOWNHOME ASSOCIATION INC

Defendants and Others

84 LUMBER COMPANY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

RANEY CONSTRUCTION INC

KB HOME ORLANDO LLC

GERALD ROBERT BOENEMAN

GEORGE OLIVER GLANCE III

CHRIS PATRICK GREENEN

DOUGLAS CHRISTOPHER GUY

RICHARD MANNING WOODLEY

84 LUMBE COMPANY AKA

ADVANCED WRAPPING AND CONCRETE SOLUTIONS OF CENTRAL FLORIDA INC

C STERLING QUALITY ROOFING INC

COLLIS ROOFING INC

LEGENDS PAINTING SERVICE LLC

STRONG VALUE SVC LLC

M & D PROFESSIONAL PAINTING INC

ACR FAMILY CONSTRUCTION, INC. NKA

21 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRETT ROTH

Defendant Attorneys

MARK SMITH

MAI LE

JASON PERKINS

ROUSELLE SUTTON

RINALDO CARTAYA

Other Attorney

CHARLOTTE WARREN

Other Attorneys

ALEX SARSFIELD

AMY DEMARTINO

 

Court Documents

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Notice of Taking Deposition(s)

Court Minutes

Court Minutes

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: UPON LAZARO WINDOWS AND DOORS LLC

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Notice of Filing

Notice of Filing

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Notice of Service of Interrogatories

Request to Produce

Request to Produce

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Subpoena Returned Served

Subpoena Returned Served; Comments: WINDOWS & DOORS BY PUENTES LLC

Summons Returned Served

Summons Returned Served; Comments: NEW ALENCO WINDOW LTD

Reply to Affirmative Defenses

Reply to Affirmative Defenses; Comments: AND KB HOME ORLANDO LLC'S REPLY TO RANEY CONSTRUCTION, INC.'S ANSWER ON CROSSCLAIM

Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing; Comments: TUESDAY, JANUARY 10, 2023

Order Setting Pre-Trial Conference

Order Setting Pre-Trial Conference; Comments: 10/1/2024 9:30 Trial Beginning 10/14/2024

Answer & Third Party Complaint/Petition

Answer & Third Party Complaint/Petition; Comments: WITH AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

175 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Taking Deposition(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • HearingHearing: Ex Parte - Jordan, John E (Actual: Jordan, John E); Location: Hearing Room 1400.02

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • HearingHearing: Ex Parte - Jordan, John E (Actual: Jordan, John E); Location: Video/Audio/Tele Conference

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCourt Minutes

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketHEARING - Ex Parte - Jordan, John E (Actual: Jordan, John E)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketHEARING - Ex Parte - Jordan, John E (Actual: Jordan, John E)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Returned Served; Comments: UPON LAZARO WINDOWS AND DOORS LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
192 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: em atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: em atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued Electronically as to; Comments: em atty

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: ROTH, BRETT JUSTIN; Amount: -150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 150.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Payment; Payer: Brett Justin Roth; Amount: -425.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • FinancialDescription: Transaction Assessment; Amount: 425.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketCase Initiated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less